Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session

Rhode Island House Bill H5812 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22
33
44
55 2023 -- H 5812
66 ========
77 LC001389
88 ========
99 S TATE OF RHODE IS LAND
1010 IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY
1111 JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023
1212 ____________
1313
1414 A N A C T
1515 RELATING TO PUBLIC OFFICERS AND EMPLOYEES -- RETIREMENT SYSTEM --
1616 CONTRIBUTIONS AND BE NEFITS
1717 Introduced By: Representative William W. O'Brien
1818 Date Introduced: February 22, 2023
1919 Referred To: House Finance
2020
2121
2222 It is enacted by the General Assembly as follows:
2323 SECTION 1. Section 36-10-1 of the General Laws in Chapter 36-10 entitled "Retirement 1
2424 System — Contributions and Benefits" is hereby amended to read as follows: 2
2525 36-10-1. Member contributions — Deduction from compensation. 3
2626 (a) Prior to July 1, 2012, each member of the retirement system shall contribute an amount 4
2727 equal to eight and three-quarters percent (8.75%) of his or her compensation as his or her share of 5
2828 the cost of annuities, benefits, and allowances. Effective July 1, 2012, each member of the 6
2929 retirement system shall contribute an amount equal to three and three quarters percent (3.75%) of 7
3030 his or her compensation, except for correctional officers as defined in § 36-10-9.2 who shall 8
3131 contribute an amount equal to eight and three quarters percent (8.75%) of his or her compensation. 9
3232 Effective July 1, 2015, each member of the retirement system, except for correctional officers as 10
3333 defined in § 36-10-9.2, with twenty (20) or more years of total service as of June 30, 2012 shall 11
3434 contribute an amount equal to eleven percent (11%) of compensation. The contributions shall be 12
3535 made in the form of deductions from compensation. Effective July 1, 2023, state employees 13
3636 employed as environmental police officers by the department of environmental management shall 14
3737 contribute an amount equal to ten percent (10%) of their compensation. 15
3838 (b) The deductions provided for herein shall be made notwithstanding that the minimum 16
3939 compensation provided by law for any member shall be reduced thereby. Every member shall be 17
4040 deemed to consent and agree to the deductions made and provided for herein and receipt of his or 18
4141
4242
4343 LC001389 - Page 2 of 4
4444 her full compensation and payment of compensation, less the deductions, shall be a full and 1
4545 complete discharge and acquittance of all claims and demands whatsoever for the services rendered 2
4646 by the person during the period covered by the payment except as to the benefit provided under this 3
4747 chapter. 4
4848 SECTION 2. Section 36-10.3-1 of the General Laws in Chapter 36-10.3 entitled "Defined 5
4949 Contribution Retirement Plan" is hereby amended to read as follows: 6
5050 36-10.3-1. Definitions. 7
5151 As used in this chapter, the following terms, unless the context requires a different 8
5252 interpretation, shall have the following meanings: 9
5353 (1) “Compensation” means compensation as defined in § 36-8-1(8). 10
5454 (2) “Employee” means an employee as defined in §§ 36-8-1(9) and 45-21-2(7) and a 11
5555 teacher as defined in § 16-16-1(12), effective July 1, 2012; provided however, effective July 1, 12
5656 2015, “employee” shall not include any employee with twenty (20) or more years of total service 13
5757 as of June 30, 2012, in the employees retirement system under chapters 8 through 10 of title 36 or 14
5858 chapter 16 of title 16 (ERS), or the municipal employees retirement system under chapter 21 of 15
5959 title 45 (MERS); provided, however, effective July 1, 2023, "employee" shall not include 16
6060 environmental police officers employed by the department of environmental management. 17
6161 (3) “Employer” means the State of Rhode Island or the local municipality which employs 18
6262 a member of the Employees Retirement System under chapters 8 through 10 of title 36 or chapter 19
6363 16 of title 16 (ERS) or the Municipal Employees Retirement System under chapters 21 and 21.2 of 20
6464 title 45 (MERS). 21
6565 (4) “Plan” means the retirement plan established by this chapter. 22
6666 (5) A “public safety member” shall mean a member of MERS who is a municipal fire 23
6767 fighter or a municipal policeman or policewoman as defined in § 45-21.2-2 who does not participate 24
6868 in Social Security under the Federal Old Age, Survivors, and Disability income program. 25
6969 (6) “Regular member” means: 26
7070 (i) An employee who is a member of ERS other than correctional officers as defined in § 27
7171 36-10-9.2; or 28
7272 (ii) An employee who is a member of MERS other than a public safety member. 29
7373 (7) The “retirement board” or “board” shall mean the retirement board of the Employees 30
7474 Retirement System of Rhode Island as defined in chapter 8 of this title. The retirement board shall 31
7575 be the plan administrator and plan trustee and shall administer the plan in accordance with § 36-8-32
7676 4.1. 33
7777 (8) “State investment commission” or “commission” means the state investment 34
7878
7979
8080 LC001389 - Page 3 of 4
8181 commission as defined in § 35-10-1. 1
8282 (9) “Supplemental employer” includes any employer that provides supplemental 2
8383 contributions to the defined contribution retirement plan as provided in § 36-10.3-3. 3
8484 (10) “Supplemental member” is defined in § 36-10.3-3. 4
8585 SECTION 3. Chapter 36-10 of the General Laws entitled "Retirement System - 5
8686 Contributions and Benefits" is hereby amended by adding thereto the following section: 6
8787 36-10-9.8. Retirement on service allowance -- State law enforcement professionals. 7
8888 Effective July 1, 2023, notwithstanding any special law or general law, rule or regulation 8
8989 to the contrary, state employees employed as environmental police officers employed by the 9
9090 department of environmental management shall be entitled to the benefits provided by §§ 45-21.2-10
9191 5, 45-21.2-6, 45-21.2-10, 45-21.2-11, 45-21.2-12, and 45-21.2-13. 11
9292 SECTION 4. This act shall take effect upon passage. 12
9393 ========
9494 LC001389
9595 ========
9696
9797
9898 LC001389 - Page 4 of 4
9999 EXPLANATION
100100 BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL
101101 OF
102102 A N A C T
103103 RELATING TO PUBLIC OFFICERS AND EMPLOYEES -- RETIREMENT SYSTEM --
104104 CONTRIBUTIONS AND BE NEFITS
105105 ***
106106 This act would, effective July 1, 2023, entitle environmental police officers to the benefits 1
107107 provided by chapter 21.2 of title 45 entitled "Optional retirement for members of police force and 2
108108 firefighters." 3
109109 This act would take effect upon passage. 4
110110 ========
111111 LC001389
112112 ========