Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session

Rhode Island House Bill H5812 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/22/2023

                             
 
 
 
2023 -- H 5812 
======== 
LC001389 
======== 
S TATE  OF RHODE IS LAND 
IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY 
JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 
____________ 
 
A N   A C T 
RELATING TO PUBLIC OFFICERS AND EMPLOYEES -- RETIREMENT SYSTEM -- 
CONTRIBUTIONS AND BE NEFITS 
Introduced By: Representative William W. O'Brien 
Date Introduced: February 22, 2023 
Referred To: House Finance 
 
 
It is enacted by the General Assembly as follows: 
SECTION 1. Section 36-10-1 of the General Laws in Chapter 36-10 entitled "Retirement 1 
System — Contributions and Benefits" is hereby amended to read as follows: 2 
36-10-1. Member contributions — Deduction from compensation. 3 
(a) Prior to July 1, 2012, each member of the retirement system shall contribute an amount 4 
equal to eight and three-quarters percent (8.75%) of his or her compensation as his or her share of 5 
the cost of annuities, benefits, and allowances. Effective July 1, 2012, each member of the 6 
retirement system shall contribute an amount equal to three and three quarters percent (3.75%) of 7 
his or her compensation, except for correctional officers as defined in § 36-10-9.2 who shall 8 
contribute an amount equal to eight and three quarters percent (8.75%) of his or her compensation. 9 
Effective July 1, 2015, each member of the retirement system, except for correctional officers as 10 
defined in § 36-10-9.2, with twenty (20) or more years of total service as of June 30, 2012 shall 11 
contribute an amount equal to eleven percent (11%) of compensation. The contributions shall be 12 
made in the form of deductions from compensation. Effective July 1, 2023, state employees 13 
employed as environmental police officers by the department of environmental management shall 14 
contribute an amount equal to ten percent (10%) of their compensation. 15 
(b) The deductions provided for herein shall be made notwithstanding that the minimum 16 
compensation provided by law for any member shall be reduced thereby. Every member shall be 17 
deemed to consent and agree to the deductions made and provided for herein and receipt of his or 18   
 
 
LC001389 - Page 2 of 4 
her full compensation and payment of compensation, less the deductions, shall be a full and 1 
complete discharge and acquittance of all claims and demands whatsoever for the services rendered 2 
by the person during the period covered by the payment except as to the benefit provided under this 3 
chapter. 4 
SECTION 2. Section 36-10.3-1 of the General Laws in Chapter 36-10.3 entitled "Defined 5 
Contribution Retirement Plan" is hereby amended to read as follows: 6 
36-10.3-1. Definitions. 7 
As used in this chapter, the following terms, unless the context requires a different 8 
interpretation, shall have the following meanings: 9 
(1) “Compensation” means compensation as defined in § 36-8-1(8). 10 
(2) “Employee” means an employee as defined in §§ 36-8-1(9) and 45-21-2(7) and a 11 
teacher as defined in § 16-16-1(12), effective July 1, 2012; provided however, effective July 1, 12 
2015, “employee” shall not include any employee with twenty (20) or more years of total service 13 
as of June 30, 2012, in the employees retirement system under chapters 8 through 10 of title 36 or 14 
chapter 16 of title 16 (ERS), or the municipal employees retirement system under chapter 21 of 15 
title 45 (MERS); provided, however, effective July 1, 2023, "employee" shall not include 16 
environmental police officers employed by the department of environmental management. 17 
(3) “Employer” means the State of Rhode Island or the local municipality which employs 18 
a member of the Employees Retirement System under chapters 8 through 10 of title 36 or chapter 19 
16 of title 16 (ERS) or the Municipal Employees Retirement System under chapters 21 and 21.2 of 20 
title 45 (MERS). 21 
(4) “Plan” means the retirement plan established by this chapter. 22 
(5) A “public safety member” shall mean a member of MERS who is a municipal fire 23 
fighter or a municipal policeman or policewoman as defined in § 45-21.2-2 who does not participate 24 
in Social Security under the Federal Old Age, Survivors, and Disability income program. 25 
(6) “Regular member” means: 26 
(i) An employee who is a member of ERS other than correctional officers as defined in § 27 
36-10-9.2; or 28 
(ii) An employee who is a member of MERS other than a public safety member. 29 
(7) The “retirement board” or “board” shall mean the retirement board of the Employees 30 
Retirement System of Rhode Island as defined in chapter 8 of this title. The retirement board shall 31 
be the plan administrator and plan trustee and shall administer the plan in accordance with § 36-8-32 
4.1. 33 
(8) “State investment commission” or “commission” means the state investment 34   
 
 
LC001389 - Page 3 of 4 
commission as defined in § 35-10-1. 1 
(9) “Supplemental employer” includes any employer that provides supplemental 2 
contributions to the defined contribution retirement plan as provided in § 36-10.3-3. 3 
(10) “Supplemental member” is defined in § 36-10.3-3. 4 
SECTION 3. Chapter 36-10 of the General Laws entitled "Retirement System - 5 
Contributions and Benefits" is hereby amended by adding thereto the following section: 6 
36-10-9.8. Retirement on service allowance -- State law enforcement professionals.   7 
Effective July 1, 2023, notwithstanding any special law or general law, rule or regulation 8 
to the contrary, state employees employed as environmental police officers employed by the 9 
department of environmental management shall be entitled to the benefits provided by §§ 45-21.2-10 
5, 45-21.2-6, 45-21.2-10, 45-21.2-11, 45-21.2-12, and 45-21.2-13. 11 
SECTION 4. This act shall take effect upon passage. 12 
======== 
LC001389 
========  
 
 
LC001389 - Page 4 of 4 
EXPLANATION 
BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL 
OF 
A N   A C T 
RELATING TO PUBLIC OFFICERS AND EMPLOYEES -- RETIREMENT SYSTEM -- 
CONTRIBUTIONS AND BE NEFITS 
***
This act would, effective July 1, 2023, entitle environmental police officers to the benefits 1 
provided by chapter 21.2 of title 45 entitled "Optional retirement for members of police force and 2 
firefighters." 3 
This act would take effect upon passage. 4 
======== 
LC001389 
========