Senate | 06/12/2023 | Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government | ||
House | 06/12/2023 | House passed Sub A | ||
House | 06/09/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/12/2023) | ||
House | 06/08/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (06/08/2023) | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/17/2023) | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Meeting postponed (03/14/2023) | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |