1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | 2023 -- H 5972 |
---|
6 | 6 | | ======== |
---|
7 | 7 | | LC002052 |
---|
8 | 8 | | ======== |
---|
9 | 9 | | S TATE OF RHODE IS LAND |
---|
10 | 10 | | IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY |
---|
11 | 11 | | JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 |
---|
12 | 12 | | ____________ |
---|
13 | 13 | | |
---|
14 | 14 | | C O N C U R R E N T R E S O L U T I O N |
---|
15 | 15 | | TERMINATING THE CURRENT DECLARAT ION OF STATE EMERGENCY AND ALL |
---|
16 | 16 | | EXECUTIVE ORDERS COM MENCING ON FEBRUARY 9, 2023, THROUGH MARCH 11, |
---|
17 | 17 | | 2023 |
---|
18 | 18 | | Introduced By: Representative Brian C. Newberry |
---|
19 | 19 | | Date Introduced: March 01, 2023 |
---|
20 | 20 | | Referred To: House State Government & Elections |
---|
21 | 21 | | |
---|
22 | 22 | | |
---|
23 | 23 | | WHEREAS, Section 30-15-9 of the Rhode Island General Laws provides that the 1 |
---|
24 | 24 | | General Assembly by concurrent resolution, may terminate a state of disaster emergency at any 2 |
---|
25 | 25 | | time and any executive orders issued pursuant thereto; and 3 |
---|
26 | 26 | | WHEREAS, On March 9, 2020, Governor Raimondo issued Executive Order 20-02 4 |
---|
27 | 27 | | executing her power to declare a state of emergency due to the dangers to health and life posed by 5 |
---|
28 | 28 | | SARS-CoV-2; and 6 |
---|
29 | 29 | | WHEREAS, Executive Order 20-02 was further extended by Governor McKee through 7 |
---|
30 | 30 | | December 11, 2022, and on December 9, 2022, Executive Order 20-02 was again extended 8 |
---|
31 | 31 | | through January 10, 2023; and 9 |
---|
32 | 32 | | WHEREAS, On January 9, 2023, Governor McKee issued Executive order 23-01, which 10 |
---|
33 | 33 | | extended Executive Order 20-02 through February 9, 2023 and on February 9, 2023, Executive 11 |
---|
34 | 34 | | Order 23-02 once again extended Executive Order 20-02 until March 11, 2023; now, therefore be 12 |
---|
35 | 35 | | it 13 |
---|
36 | 36 | | RESOLVED, That this General Assembly of the State of Rhode Island hereby terminates 14 |
---|
37 | 37 | | Executive Order 23-02, together with all recommendations, directions, and orders, whether 15 |
---|
38 | 38 | | written or oral, issued pursuant thereto, in accordance with Section 30-15-9 of the Rhode Island 16 |
---|
39 | 39 | | General Laws; and be it further 17 |
---|
40 | 40 | | |
---|
41 | 41 | | |
---|
42 | 42 | | LC002052 - Page 2 of 2 |
---|
43 | 43 | | RESOLVED, That the Secretary of State be and hereby is authorized and directed to 1 |
---|
44 | 44 | | transmit a duly certified copy of this resolution to the Honorable Daniel McKee, Governor of the 2 |
---|
45 | 45 | | State of Rhode Island. 3 |
---|
46 | 46 | | ======== |
---|
47 | 47 | | LC002052 |
---|
48 | 48 | | ======== |
---|