Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session

Rhode Island House Bill H5972 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/01/2023

                             
 
 
 
2023 -- H 5972 
======== 
LC002052 
======== 
S TATE  OF RHODE IS LAND 
IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY 
JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 
____________ 
 
C O N C U R R E N T  R E S O L U T I O N 
TERMINATING THE CURRENT DECLARAT ION OF STATE EMERGENCY AND ALL 
EXECUTIVE ORDERS COM MENCING ON FEBRUARY 9, 2023, THROUGH MARCH 11, 
2023 
Introduced By: Representative Brian C. Newberry 
Date Introduced: March 01, 2023 
Referred To: House State Government & Elections 
 
 
WHEREAS, Section 30-15-9 of the Rhode Island General Laws provides that the 1 
General Assembly by concurrent resolution, may terminate a state of disaster emergency at any 2 
time and any executive orders issued pursuant thereto; and  3 
WHEREAS, On March 9, 2020, Governor Raimondo issued Executive Order 20-02 4 
executing her power to declare a state of emergency due to the dangers to health and life posed by 5 
SARS-CoV-2; and    6 
WHEREAS, Executive Order 20-02 was further extended by Governor McKee through 7 
December 11, 2022, and on December 9, 2022, Executive Order 20-02 was again extended 8 
through January 10, 2023; and 9 
WHEREAS, On January 9, 2023, Governor McKee issued Executive order 23-01, which 10 
extended Executive Order 20-02 through February 9, 2023 and on February 9, 2023, Executive 11 
Order 23-02 once again extended Executive Order 20-02 until March 11, 2023; now, therefore be 12 
it 13 
RESOLVED, That this General Assembly of the State of Rhode Island hereby terminates 14 
Executive Order 23-02, together with all recommendations, directions, and orders, whether 15 
written or oral, issued pursuant thereto, in accordance with Section 30-15-9 of the Rhode Island 16 
General Laws; and be it further  17   
 
 
LC002052 - Page 2 of 2 
RESOLVED, That the Secretary of State be and hereby is authorized and directed to 1 
transmit a duly certified copy of this resolution to the Honorable Daniel McKee, Governor of the 2 
State of Rhode Island. 3 
======== 
LC002052 
========