House | 06/21/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/15/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/13/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | House passed Sub A | ||
House | 05/19/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (05/23/2023) | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (05/09/2023) | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/17/2023) | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Meeting postponed (03/14/2023) | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | ||
House | 03/05/2023 | Committee transferred to House Corporations | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |