House | 05/15/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Senate passed in concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/09/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | ||
Senate | 04/28/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/04/2023) | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Referred to Senate Judiciary | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | House read and passed | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (04/18/2023) | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2023) | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Special Legislation |