1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | 2023 -- H 6254 |
---|
6 | 6 | | ======== |
---|
7 | 7 | | LC002777 |
---|
8 | 8 | | ======== |
---|
9 | 9 | | S T A T E O F R H O D E I S L A N D |
---|
10 | 10 | | IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY |
---|
11 | 11 | | JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 |
---|
12 | 12 | | ____________ |
---|
13 | 13 | | |
---|
14 | 14 | | H O U S E R E S O L U T I O N |
---|
15 | 15 | | EXTENDING THE REPORTING AND EXPIRATION DATES OF THE SPECIAL |
---|
16 | 16 | | LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO STUDY THE EFFECTS AND IMPACT THAT HYBRID |
---|
17 | 17 | | AND VIRTUAL LEARNING EMPLOYED DURING THE PANDEMIC HAS HAD ON THE |
---|
18 | 18 | | ACHIEVEMENT RATES OF CHILDREN IN KINDERGARTEN THROUGH 12TH GRADE |
---|
19 | 19 | | Introduced By: Representative Julie A. Casimiro |
---|
20 | 20 | | Date Introduced: April 05, 2023 |
---|
21 | 21 | | Referred To: House Education |
---|
22 | 22 | | |
---|
23 | 23 | | |
---|
24 | 24 | | RESOLVED, That the special legislative commission created by resolution No. 340 1 |
---|
25 | 25 | | passed by the House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2022, and approved June 1, 2 |
---|
26 | 26 | | 2022, entitled "House Resolution Creating a Special Legislative Commission to Study the Effects 3 |
---|
27 | 27 | | and Impact that Hybrid and Virtual Learning Employed During the Pandemic has had on the 4 |
---|
28 | 28 | | Achievement Rates of Children in Kindergarten through 12th Grade” and as extended by 5 |
---|
29 | 29 | | resolution No. 114 passed by the House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2023, and 6 |
---|
30 | 30 | | approved February 14, 2023, entitled "House Resolution Extending the Reporting and expiration 7 |
---|
31 | 31 | | Dates of the Special Legislative Commission to Study the Effects and Impact that Hybrid and 8 |
---|
32 | 32 | | Virtual Learning Employed During the Pandemic has had on the Achievement Rates of Children 9 |
---|
33 | 33 | | in Kindergarten through 12th Grade” is hereby authorized to continue its study and make a report 10 |
---|
34 | 34 | | to the House of Representatives on or before November 15, 2024, and said commission shall 11 |
---|
35 | 35 | | expire on November 29, 2024; and be it further 12 |
---|
36 | 36 | | RESOLVED, That the time for reporting authorized by resolution No. 340 passed by the 13 |
---|
37 | 37 | | House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2022, and approved June 1, 2022, and 14 |
---|
38 | 38 | | extended by resolution No. 114 passed by the House of Representatives at its January session, 15 |
---|
39 | 39 | | A.D. 2023, and approved February 14, 2023, be and the same is hereby rescinded. 16 |
---|
40 | 40 | | ======== |
---|
41 | 41 | | LC002777 |
---|
42 | 42 | | ======== |
---|
43 | 43 | | |
---|
44 | 44 | | |
---|
45 | 45 | | LC002777 - Page 2 of 2 |
---|
46 | 46 | | EXPLANATION |
---|
47 | 47 | | BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL |
---|
48 | 48 | | OF |
---|
49 | 49 | | H O U S E R E S O L U T I O N |
---|
50 | 50 | | EXTENDING THE REPORT ING AND EXPIRATION DATES OF THE SPECIAL |
---|
51 | 51 | | LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO STUDY THE EFFECTS AND IMPACT THAT HYBRID |
---|
52 | 52 | | AND VIRTUAL LEARNING EMPLOYED DURING THE PANDEMIC HAS HAD ON THE |
---|
53 | 53 | | ACHIEVEMENT RATES OF CHILDREN IN KINDERGARTEN THROUGH 12TH GRADE |
---|
54 | 54 | | *** |
---|
55 | 55 | | This resolution would extend the reporting and expiration dates of the commission to 1 |
---|
56 | 56 | | study the effects and impact of hybrid and virtual learning during the pandemic, from July 31, 2 |
---|
57 | 57 | | 2024, to November 15, 2024, and would expire on November 29, 2024. 3 |
---|
58 | 58 | | ======== |
---|
59 | 59 | | LC002777 |
---|
60 | 60 | | ======== |
---|