Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session

Rhode Island House Bill H6254 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 04/05/2023

                             
 
 
 
2023 -- H 6254 
======== 
LC002777 
======== 
S T A T E O F R H O D E I S L A N D 
IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY 
JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 
____________ 
 
H O U S E   R E S O L U T I O N 
EXTENDING THE REPORTING AND EXPIRATION DATES OF THE SPECIAL 
LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO STUDY THE EFFECTS AND IMPACT THAT HYBRID 
AND VIRTUAL LEARNING EMPLOYED DURING THE PANDEMIC HAS HAD ON THE 
ACHIEVEMENT RATES OF CHILDREN IN KINDERGARTEN THROUGH 12TH GRADE 
Introduced By: Representative Julie A. Casimiro 
Date Introduced: April 05, 2023 
Referred To: House Education 
 
 
RESOLVED, That the special legislative commission created by resolution No. 340 1 
passed by the House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2022, and approved June 1, 2 
2022, entitled "House Resolution Creating a Special Legislative Commission to Study the Effects 3 
and Impact that Hybrid and Virtual Learning Employed During the Pandemic has had on the 4 
Achievement Rates of Children in Kindergarten through 12th Grade” and as extended by 5 
resolution No. 114 passed by the House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2023, and 6 
approved February 14, 2023, entitled "House Resolution Extending the Reporting and expiration 7 
Dates of the Special Legislative Commission to Study the Effects and Impact that Hybrid and 8 
Virtual Learning Employed During the Pandemic has had on the Achievement Rates of Children 9 
in Kindergarten through 12th Grade” is hereby authorized to continue its study and make a report 10 
to the House of Representatives on or before November 15, 2024, and said commission shall 11 
expire on November 29, 2024; and be it further  12 
RESOLVED, That the time for reporting authorized by resolution No. 340 passed by the 13 
House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2022, and approved June 1, 2022, and 14 
extended by resolution No. 114 passed by the House of Representatives at its January session, 15 
A.D. 2023, and approved February 14, 2023, be and the same is hereby rescinded. 16 
======== 
LC002777 
========  
 
 
LC002777 - Page 2 of 2 
EXPLANATION 
BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL 
OF 
H O U S E   R E S O L U T I O N 
EXTENDING THE REPORT ING AND EXPIRATION DATES OF THE SPECIAL 
LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO STUDY THE EFFECTS AND IMPACT THAT HYBRID 
AND VIRTUAL LEARNING EMPLOYED DURING THE PANDEMIC HAS HAD ON THE 
ACHIEVEMENT RATES OF CHILDREN IN KINDERGARTEN THROUGH 12TH GRADE 
***
This resolution would extend the reporting and expiration dates of the commission to 1 
study the effects and impact of hybrid and virtual learning during the pandemic, from July 31, 2 
2024, to November 15, 2024, and would expire on November 29, 2024. 3 
======== 
LC002777 
========