LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Rhode Island RI
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
House
Bills
H6341
Action History
RI
Rhode Island House Bill H6341
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6341
Action History
House
06/12/2023
House read and passed
House
06/09/2023
Placed on House Calendar (06/12/2023)
House
05/16/2023
Committee recommends passage
House
05/12/2023
Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2023)
House
04/28/2023
Introduced, referred to House Corporations