Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session

Rhode Island House Bill H6341 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 04/28/2023

                             
 
 
 
2023 -- H 6341 
======== 
LC002894 
======== 
S T A T E O F R H O D E I S L A N D 
IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY 
JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 
____________ 
 
H O U S E   R E S O L U T I O N 
REINSTATING AND EXTENDING THE REPORT ING AND EXPIRATION DATES OF THE 
SPECIAL LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO STUDY RHODE ISLAND'S MINIMUM 
PRICING STATUTES 
Introduced By: Representatives Phillips, Serpa, Costantino, Lima, Corvese, Casey, and 
J. Brien 
Date Introduced: April 28, 2023 
Referred To: House Corporations 
 
 
RESOLVED, That the special legislative commission created by resolution No. 344 1 
passed by the House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2017, and approved June 26, 2 
2017, entitled "House Resolution Creating a Special Legislative Commission To Study Rhode 3 
Island's Minimum Pricing Statutes" and as extended by resolution No. 152 passed by the House 4 
of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2018, and approved April 3, 2018, entitled "House 5 
Resolution Extending the Reporting and Expiration Dates of the Special Legislative Commission 6 
To Study Rhode Island's Minimum Pricing Statutes" is hereby reinstated and the same members 7 
are hereby reappointed, and it is authorized to continue its study and make a report to the House 8 
of Representatives on or before April 4, 2024, and said commission shall expire on June 4, 2024; 9 
and be it further 10 
RESOLVED, That the time for reporting authorized by resolution No. 344 passed by the 11 
House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2017, and approved June 26, 2017, and as 12 
extended by resolution No. 152 passed by the House of Representatives at its January session, 13 
A.D. 2018, and approved April 3, 2018, be and the same is hereby rescinded. 14 
======== 
LC002894 
========  
 
 
LC002894 - Page 2 of 2 
EXPLANATION 
BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL 
OF 
H O U S E   R E S O L U T I O N 
REINSTATING AND EXTENDING THE REPORTING AND EXPIRATION DATES OF THE 
SPECIAL LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO STUDY RHODE ISLAND'S MINIMUM 
PRICING STATUTES 
***
This resolution would reinstate the life and extend the reporting and expiration dates of 1 
the Special Legislative Commission to Study Rhode Island's Minimum Pricing Statutes from 2 
April 4, 2019, to April 4, 2024, and said commission would expire on June 4, 2024.   3 
======== 
LC002894 
========