1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | 2023 -- H 6370 |
---|
6 | 6 | | ======== |
---|
7 | 7 | | LC002831 |
---|
8 | 8 | | ======== |
---|
9 | 9 | | S T A T E O F R H O D E I S L A N D |
---|
10 | 10 | | IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY |
---|
11 | 11 | | JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 |
---|
12 | 12 | | ____________ |
---|
13 | 13 | | |
---|
14 | 14 | | H O U S E R E S O L U T I O N |
---|
15 | 15 | | EXTENDING THE REPORTING AND EXPIRATION DATES FOR THE SPECIAL |
---|
16 | 16 | | LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO STUDY AND MAKE RECOMMENDATIONS FOR THE |
---|
17 | 17 | | PLACEMENT OF SOLAR PANELS ON INTER-STATE HIGHWAYS |
---|
18 | 18 | | Introduced By: Representative Robert D. Phillips |
---|
19 | 19 | | Date Introduced: May 05, 2023 |
---|
20 | 20 | | Referred To: House Corporations |
---|
21 | 21 | | |
---|
22 | 22 | | |
---|
23 | 23 | | RESOLVED, That the special house commission created by resolution No. 411 passed by 1 |
---|
24 | 24 | | the House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2022, and approved June 24, 2022, 2 |
---|
25 | 25 | | entitled "HOUSE RESOLUTION CREATING A SPECIAL LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO 3 |
---|
26 | 26 | | STUDY AND MAKE REC OMMENDATIONS FOR THE PLACEMENT OF SOLAR PANELS 4 |
---|
27 | 27 | | ON INTER-STATE HIGHWAYS" is hereby authorized to continue its study and make a report 5 |
---|
28 | 28 | | to the House of Representatives on or before April 11, 2024, and said commission shall expire on 6 |
---|
29 | 29 | | June 11, 2024; and be it further 7 |
---|
30 | 30 | | RESOLVED, That the time for reporting authorized by resolution No. 411 passed by the 8 |
---|
31 | 31 | | House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2022, and approved June 24, 2022, be and 9 |
---|
32 | 32 | | the same is hereby rescinded. 10 |
---|
33 | 33 | | ======== |
---|
34 | 34 | | LC002831 |
---|
35 | 35 | | ======== |
---|
36 | 36 | | |
---|
37 | 37 | | |
---|
38 | 38 | | LC002831 - Page 2 of 2 |
---|
39 | 39 | | EXPLANATION |
---|
40 | 40 | | BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL |
---|
41 | 41 | | OF |
---|
42 | 42 | | H O U S E R E S O L U T I O N |
---|
43 | 43 | | EXTENDING THE REPORT ING AND EXPIRATION DATES FOR THE SPECIAL |
---|
44 | 44 | | LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO STUDY AND MAKE RECOMMENDATIONS FOR THE |
---|
45 | 45 | | PLACEMENT OF SOLAR PANELS ON INTER-STATE HIGHWAYS |
---|
46 | 46 | | *** |
---|
47 | 47 | | This resolution would extend the reporting and expiration dates of the commission to 1 |
---|
48 | 48 | | study and make recommendations on placement of solar panels on inter-state highways from 2 |
---|
49 | 49 | | April 11, 2023, to April 11, 2024, and would expire on June 11, 2024. 3 |
---|
50 | 50 | | ======== |
---|
51 | 51 | | LC002831 |
---|
52 | 52 | | ======== |
---|