Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session

Rhode Island House Bill H6370 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 05/05/2023

                             
 
 
 
2023 -- H 6370 
======== 
LC002831 
======== 
S T A T E O F R H O D E I S L A N D 
IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY 
JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 
____________ 
 
H O U S E   R E S O L U T I O N 
EXTENDING THE REPORTING AND EXPIRATION DATES FOR THE SPECIAL 
LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO STUDY AND MAKE RECOMMENDATIONS FOR THE 
PLACEMENT OF SOLAR PANELS ON INTER-STATE HIGHWAYS 
Introduced By: Representative Robert D. Phillips 
Date Introduced: May 05, 2023 
Referred To: House Corporations 
 
 
RESOLVED, That the special house commission created by resolution No. 411 passed by 1 
the House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2022, and approved June 24, 2022, 2 
entitled "HOUSE RESOLUTION CREATING A SPECIAL LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO 3 
STUDY AND MAKE REC OMMENDATIONS FOR THE PLACEMENT OF SOLAR PANELS 4 
ON INTER-STATE HIGHWAYS" is hereby authorized to continue its study and make a report 5 
to the House of Representatives on or before April 11, 2024, and said commission shall expire on 6 
June 11, 2024; and be it further  7 
RESOLVED, That the time for reporting authorized by resolution No. 411 passed by the 8 
House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2022, and approved June 24, 2022, be and 9 
the same is hereby rescinded. 10 
======== 
LC002831 
========  
 
 
LC002831 - Page 2 of 2 
EXPLANATION 
BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL 
OF 
H O U S E   R E S O L U T I O N 
EXTENDING THE REPORT ING AND EXPIRATION DATES FOR THE SPECIAL 
LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO STUDY AND MAKE RECOMMENDATIONS FOR THE 
PLACEMENT OF SOLAR PANELS ON INTER-STATE HIGHWAYS 
***
This resolution would extend the reporting and expiration dates of the commission to 1 
study and make recommendations on placement of solar panels on inter-state highways from 2 
April 11, 2023, to April 11, 2024, and would expire on June 11, 2024. 3 
======== 
LC002831 
========