House | 06/23/2023 | Effective without Governor's signature | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Senate passed in concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/13/2023 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/15/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/13/2023 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Referred to Senate Judiciary | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | House read and passed | ||
House | 06/02/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/06/2023) | ||
House | 05/30/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
House | 05/26/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/30/2023) | ||
House | 05/19/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Special Legislation |