House | 06/26/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
House | 06/19/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/16/2023 | Senate passed in concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/15/2023) | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | House read and passed | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/15/2023) | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
House | 06/12/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 06/11/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2023) | ||
House | 06/09/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/12/2023) | ||
House | 06/09/2023 | Committee transferred to House Education | ||
House | 06/08/2023 | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |