Senate | 05/01/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | House passed in concurrence | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (04/18/2023) | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | ||
House | 04/02/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2023) | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Referred to House State Government & Elections | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Senate read and passed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/16/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/07/2023) | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |