1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | 2023 -- S 0201 |
---|
6 | 6 | | ======== |
---|
7 | 7 | | LC001075 |
---|
8 | 8 | | ======== |
---|
9 | 9 | | S TATE OF RHODE IS LAND |
---|
10 | 10 | | IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY |
---|
11 | 11 | | JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 |
---|
12 | 12 | | ____________ |
---|
13 | 13 | | |
---|
14 | 14 | | A N A C T |
---|
15 | 15 | | RELATING TO HEALTH AND SAFETY -- REFUSE DISPOSAL -- FOOD WASTE BAN |
---|
16 | 16 | | Introduced By: Senators Valverde, Gu, Kallman, Miller, DiMario, Euer, LaMountain, |
---|
17 | 17 | | Acosta, Tikoian, and Ujifusa |
---|
18 | 18 | | Date Introduced: February 16, 2023 |
---|
19 | 19 | | Referred To: Senate Environment & Agriculture |
---|
20 | 20 | | |
---|
21 | 21 | | |
---|
22 | 22 | | It is enacted by the General Assembly as follows: |
---|
23 | 23 | | SECTION 1. Section 23-18.9-17 of the General Laws in Chapter 23-18.9 entitled "Refuse 1 |
---|
24 | 24 | | Disposal" is hereby amended to read as follows: 2 |
---|
25 | 25 | | 23-18.9-17. Food waste ban. 3 |
---|
26 | 26 | | (a) On and after January 1, 2016, each covered entity and each covered educational 4 |
---|
27 | 27 | | institution shall ensure that the organic-waste materials that are generated by the covered entity or 5 |
---|
28 | 28 | | at the covered educational facility are recycled at an authorized composting facility or anaerobic 6 |
---|
29 | 29 | | digestion facility or by another authorized recycling method if: 7 |
---|
30 | 30 | | (1) The covered entity or covered educational facility generates not less than one hundred 8 |
---|
31 | 31 | | four (104) tons per year of organic-waste material; and 9 |
---|
32 | 32 | | (2) The covered entity or covered educational facility is located not more than fifteen (15) 10 |
---|
33 | 33 | | miles from an authorized composting facility or anaerobic digestion facility with available capacity 11 |
---|
34 | 34 | | to accept such material. 12 |
---|
35 | 35 | | (b) On and after January 1, 2018, each covered educational institution shall ensure that the 13 |
---|
36 | 36 | | organic-waste materials that are generated at the covered educational facility are recycled at an 14 |
---|
37 | 37 | | authorized composting facility or anaerobic digestion facility or by another authorized recycling 15 |
---|
38 | 38 | | method if: 16 |
---|
39 | 39 | | (1) The covered educational facility generates not less than fifty-two (52) tons per year of 17 |
---|
40 | 40 | | organic-waste material; and 18 |
---|
41 | 41 | | (2) The covered entity or covered educational facility is located not more than fifteen (15) 19 |
---|
42 | 42 | | |
---|
43 | 43 | | |
---|
44 | 44 | | LC001075 - Page 2 of 3 |
---|
45 | 45 | | miles from an authorized composting facility or anaerobic digestion facility with available capacity 1 |
---|
46 | 46 | | to accept such material. 2 |
---|
47 | 47 | | (c) The director shall grant a waiver of the requirements of subsections (a) and (b) upon a 3 |
---|
48 | 48 | | showing that the tipping fee charged by the Rhode Island resource recovery corporation for non-4 |
---|
49 | 49 | | contract commercial sector waste is less than the fee charged for organic-waste material by each 5 |
---|
50 | 50 | | composting facility or anaerobic digestion facility located within fifteen (15) miles of the covered 6 |
---|
51 | 51 | | entity’s location. 7 |
---|
52 | 52 | | (d) On and after January 1, 2023, each educational entity (as defined in § 16-110-1) shall 8 |
---|
53 | 53 | | ensure that the organic-waste materials that are generated by the educational entity are recycled at 9 |
---|
54 | 54 | | an authorized composting facility or anaerobic digestion facility or by another authorized recycling 10 |
---|
55 | 55 | | method if: 11 |
---|
56 | 56 | | (1) The educational entity generates not less than thirty (30) tons per year of organic-waste 12 |
---|
57 | 57 | | material; and 13 |
---|
58 | 58 | | (2) The educational entity is located not more than fifteen (15) miles from an authorized 14 |
---|
59 | 59 | | composting facility or anaerobic digestion facility with available capacity to accept such material. 15 |
---|
60 | 60 | | (e) On and after January 1, 2024, each covered entity shall ensure that the organic-waste 16 |
---|
61 | 61 | | materials that are generated by the covered entity are recycled at an authorized composting facility 17 |
---|
62 | 62 | | or anaerobic digestion facility or by another authorized recycling method if: 18 |
---|
63 | 63 | | (1) The covered entity generates not less than fifty-two (52) tons per year of organic-waste 19 |
---|
64 | 64 | | material; and 20 |
---|
65 | 65 | | (2) The covered entity is located not more than thirty (30) miles from an authorized 21 |
---|
66 | 66 | | composting facility or anaerobic digestion facility with available capacity to accept such material. 22 |
---|
67 | 67 | | (f) On and after January 1, 2025, each covered entity shall ensure that the organic-waste 23 |
---|
68 | 68 | | materials that are generated by the covered entity are recycled at an authorized composting facility 24 |
---|
69 | 69 | | or anaerobic digestion facility or by another authorized recycling method if: 25 |
---|
70 | 70 | | (1) The covered entity generates not less than twenty-six (26) tons per year of organic-26 |
---|
71 | 71 | | waste material; and 27 |
---|
72 | 72 | | (2) The covered entity is located not more than thirty (30) miles from an authorized 28 |
---|
73 | 73 | | composting facility or anaerobic digestion facility with available capacity to accept such material. 29 |
---|
74 | 74 | | SECTION 2. This act shall take effect upon passage. 30 |
---|
75 | 75 | | ======== |
---|
76 | 76 | | LC001075 |
---|
77 | 77 | | ======== |
---|
78 | 78 | | |
---|
79 | 79 | | |
---|
80 | 80 | | LC001075 - Page 3 of 3 |
---|
81 | 81 | | EXPLANATION |
---|
82 | 82 | | BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL |
---|
83 | 83 | | OF |
---|
84 | 84 | | A N A C T |
---|
85 | 85 | | RELATING TO HEALTH AND SAFETY -- REFUSE DISPOSAL -- FOOD WASTE BAN |
---|
86 | 86 | | *** |
---|
87 | 87 | | This act would require a covered entity generating organic waste materials of more than 1 |
---|
88 | 88 | | fifty-two (52) tons per year and located less than thirty (30) miles from an authorized composting 2 |
---|
89 | 89 | | facility or anaerobic digestion facility to recycle the waste at that facility beginning January 1, 2024. 3 |
---|
90 | 90 | | Effective January 1, 2025, the annual tonnage drops to more than twenty-six (26) tons per year. 4 |
---|
91 | 91 | | This act would take effect upon passage. 5 |
---|
92 | 92 | | ======== |
---|
93 | 93 | | LC001075 |
---|
94 | 94 | | ======== |
---|
95 | 95 | | |
---|