Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session

Rhode Island Senate Bill S0201 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/16/2023

                             
 
 
 
2023 -- S 0201 
======== 
LC001075 
======== 
S TATE  OF RHODE IS LAND 
IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY 
JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 
____________ 
 
A N   A C T 
RELATING TO HEALTH AND SAFETY -- REFUSE DISPOSAL -- FOOD WASTE BAN 
Introduced By: Senators Valverde, Gu, Kallman, Miller, DiMario, Euer, LaMountain, 
Acosta, Tikoian, and Ujifusa 
Date Introduced: February 16, 2023 
Referred To: Senate Environment & Agriculture 
 
 
It is enacted by the General Assembly as follows: 
SECTION 1. Section 23-18.9-17 of the General Laws in Chapter 23-18.9 entitled "Refuse 1 
Disposal" is hereby amended to read as follows: 2 
23-18.9-17. Food waste ban. 3 
(a) On and after January 1, 2016, each covered entity and each covered educational 4 
institution shall ensure that the organic-waste materials that are generated by the covered entity or 5 
at the covered educational facility are recycled at an authorized composting facility or anaerobic 6 
digestion facility or by another authorized recycling method if: 7 
(1) The covered entity or covered educational facility generates not less than one hundred 8 
four (104) tons per year of organic-waste material; and 9 
(2) The covered entity or covered educational facility is located not more than fifteen (15) 10 
miles from an authorized composting facility or anaerobic digestion facility with available capacity 11 
to accept such material. 12 
(b) On and after January 1, 2018, each covered educational institution shall ensure that the 13 
organic-waste materials that are generated at the covered educational facility are recycled at an 14 
authorized composting facility or anaerobic digestion facility or by another authorized recycling 15 
method if: 16 
(1) The covered educational facility generates not less than fifty-two (52) tons per year of 17 
organic-waste material; and 18 
(2) The covered entity or covered educational facility is located not more than fifteen (15) 19   
 
 
LC001075 - Page 2 of 3 
miles from an authorized composting facility or anaerobic digestion facility with available capacity 1 
to accept such material. 2 
(c) The director shall grant a waiver of the requirements of subsections (a) and (b) upon a 3 
showing that the tipping fee charged by the Rhode Island resource recovery corporation for non-4 
contract commercial sector waste is less than the fee charged for organic-waste material by each 5 
composting facility or anaerobic digestion facility located within fifteen (15) miles of the covered 6 
entity’s location. 7 
(d) On and after January 1, 2023, each educational entity (as  defined in § 16-110-1) shall 8 
ensure that the organic-waste materials that are generated by the educational entity are recycled at 9 
an authorized composting facility or anaerobic digestion facility or by another authorized recycling 10 
method if: 11 
(1) The educational entity generates not less than thirty (30) tons per year of organic-waste 12 
material; and 13 
(2) The educational entity is located not more than fifteen (15) miles from an authorized 14 
composting facility or anaerobic digestion facility with available capacity to accept such material. 15 
(e) On and after January 1, 2024, each covered entity shall ensure that the organic-waste 16 
materials that are generated by the covered entity are recycled at an authorized composting facility 17 
or anaerobic digestion facility or by another authorized recycling method if: 18 
(1) The covered entity generates not less than fifty-two (52) tons per year of organic-waste 19 
material; and 20 
(2) The covered entity is located not more than thirty (30) miles from an authorized 21 
composting facility or anaerobic digestion facility with available capacity to accept such material. 22 
(f) On and after January 1, 2025, each covered entity shall ensure that the organic-waste 23 
materials that are generated by the covered entity are recycled at an authorized composting facility 24 
or anaerobic digestion facility or by another authorized recycling method if: 25 
(1) The covered entity generates not less than twenty-six (26) tons per year of organic-26 
waste material; and 27 
(2) The covered entity is located not more than thirty (30) miles from an authorized 28 
composting facility or anaerobic digestion facility with available capacity to accept such material. 29 
SECTION 2. This act shall take effect upon passage. 30 
======== 
LC001075 
========  
 
 
LC001075 - Page 3 of 3 
EXPLANATION 
BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL 
OF 
A N   A C T 
RELATING TO HEALTH AND SAFETY -- REFUSE DISPOSAL -- FOOD WASTE BAN 
***
This act would require a covered entity generating organic waste materials of more than 1 
fifty-two (52) tons per year and located less than thirty (30) miles from an authorized composting 2 
facility or anaerobic digestion facility to recycle the waste at that facility beginning January 1, 2024. 3 
Effective January 1, 2025, the annual tonnage drops to more than twenty-six (26) tons per year.  4 
This act would take effect upon passage. 5 
======== 
LC001075 
========