House | 06/09/2023 | Referred to House Finance | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (06/07/2023) | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |