Senate | 06/14/2023 | Senate read and passed | ||
Senate | 06/13/2023 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/14/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/13/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (06/13/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2023) | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |