Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session

Rhode Island Senate Bill S0826 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22
33
44
55 2023 -- S 0826
66 ========
77 LC002657
88 ========
99 S TATE OF RHODE IS LAND
1010 IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY
1111 JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023
1212 ____________
1313
1414 A N A C T
1515 RELATING TO LABOR AND LABOR RELATIONS -- MINIMUM WAGES
1616 Introduced By: Senator Tiara T. Mack
1717 Date Introduced: March 23, 2023
1818 Referred To: Senate Labor
1919
2020
2121 It is enacted by the General Assembly as follows:
2222 SECTION 1. Section 28-12-3 of the General Laws in Chapter 28-12 entitled "Minimum 1
2323 Wages" is hereby amended to read as follows: 2
2424 28-12-3. Minimum wages. 3
2525 (a) Every employer shall pay to each of his or her employees: commencing July 1, 1999, 4
2626 at least the minimum wage of five dollars and sixty-five cents ($5.65) per hour. Commencing 5
2727 September 1, 2000, the minimum wage is six dollars and fifteen cents ($6.15) per hour. 6
2828 (b) Commencing January 1, 2004, the minimum wage is six dollars and seventy-five cents 7
2929 ($6.75) per hour. 8
3030 (c) Commencing March 1, 2006, the minimum wage is seven dollars and ten cents ($7.10) 9
3131 per hour. 10
3232 (d) Commencing January 1, 2007, the minimum wage is seven dollars and forty cents 11
3333 ($7.40) per hour. 12
3434 (e) Commencing January 1, 2013, the minimum wage is seven dollars and seventy-five 13
3535 cents ($7.75) per hour. 14
3636 (f) Commencing January 1, 2014, the minimum wage is eight dollars ($8.00) per hour. 15
3737 (g) Commencing January 1, 2015, the minimum wage is nine dollars ($9.00) per hour. 16
3838 (h) Commencing January 1, 2016, the minimum wage is nine dollars and sixty cents ($9.60) 17
3939 per hour. 18
4040 (i) Commencing January 1, 2018, the minimum wage is ten dollars and ten cents ($10.10) 19
4141
4242
4343 LC002657 - Page 2 of 3
4444 per hour. 1
4545 (j) Commencing January 1, 2019, the minimum wage is ten dollars and fifty cents ($10.50) 2
4646 per hour. 3
4747 (k) Commencing October 1, 2020, the minimum wage is eleven dollars and fifty cents 4
4848 ($11.50) per hour. 5
4949 (l) Commencing January 1, 2022, the minimum wage is twelve dollars and twenty-five 6
5050 cents ($12.25) per hour. 7
5151 (m) Commencing January 1, 2023, the minimum wage is thirteen dollars ($13.00) per hour. 8
5252 (n) Commencing January 1, 2024, the minimum wage is fourteen dollars ($14.00) per hour. 9
5353 (o) Commencing January 1, 2025, the minimum wage is fifteen dollars ($15.00) fifteen 10
5454 dollars and fifty cents ($15.50) per hour. 11
5555 (p) Commencing January 1, 2026, the minimum wage is seventeen dollars ($17.00) per 12
5656 hour. 13
5757 (q) Commencing January 1, 2027, the minimum wage is eighteen dollars and fifty cents 14
5858 ($18.50) per hour. 15
5959 (r) Commencing January 1, 2028, the minimum wage is twenty dollars ($20.00) per hour. 16
6060 SECTION 2. This act shall take effect upon passage. 17
6161 ========
6262 LC002657
6363 ========
6464
6565
6666 LC002657 - Page 3 of 3
6767 EXPLANATION
6868 BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL
6969 OF
7070 A N A C T
7171 RELATING TO LABOR AND LABOR RELATIONS -- MINIMUM WAGES
7272 ***
7373 This act would raise the minimum wage for the years 2025, 2026, 2027 and 2028 to fifteen 1
7474 dollars and fifty cents ($15.50), seventeen dollars ($17.00), eighteen dollars and fifty cents 2
7575 ($18.50), and twenty dollars ($20.00) per hour, respectively. 3
7676 This act would take effect upon passage. 4
7777 ========
7878 LC002657
7979 ========
8080