Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session

Rhode Island Senate Bill S0826 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/23/2023

                             
 
 
 
2023 -- S 0826 
======== 
LC002657 
======== 
S TATE  OF RHODE IS LAND 
IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY 
JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 
____________ 
 
A N   A C T 
RELATING TO LABOR AND LABOR RELATIONS -- MINIMUM WAGES 
Introduced By: Senator Tiara T. Mack 
Date Introduced: March 23, 2023 
Referred To: Senate Labor 
 
 
It is enacted by the General Assembly as follows: 
SECTION 1. Section 28-12-3 of the General Laws in Chapter 28-12 entitled "Minimum 1 
Wages" is hereby amended to read as follows: 2 
28-12-3. Minimum wages. 3 
(a) Every employer shall pay to each of his or her employees: commencing July 1, 1999, 4 
at least the minimum wage of five dollars and sixty-five cents ($5.65) per hour. Commencing 5 
September 1, 2000, the minimum wage is six dollars and fifteen cents ($6.15) per hour. 6 
(b) Commencing January 1, 2004, the minimum wage is six dollars and seventy-five cents 7 
($6.75) per hour. 8 
(c) Commencing March 1, 2006, the minimum wage is seven dollars and ten cents ($7.10) 9 
per hour. 10 
(d) Commencing January 1, 2007, the minimum wage is seven dollars and forty cents 11 
($7.40) per hour. 12 
(e) Commencing January 1, 2013, the minimum wage is seven dollars and seventy-five 13 
cents ($7.75) per hour. 14 
(f) Commencing January 1, 2014, the minimum wage is eight dollars ($8.00) per hour. 15 
(g) Commencing January 1, 2015, the minimum wage is nine dollars ($9.00) per hour. 16 
(h) Commencing January 1, 2016, the minimum wage is nine dollars and sixty cents ($9.60) 17 
per hour. 18 
(i) Commencing January 1, 2018, the minimum wage is ten dollars and ten cents ($10.10) 19   
 
 
LC002657 - Page 2 of 3 
per hour. 1 
(j) Commencing January 1, 2019, the minimum wage is ten dollars and fifty cents ($10.50) 2 
per hour. 3 
(k) Commencing October 1, 2020, the minimum wage is eleven dollars and fifty cents 4 
($11.50) per hour. 5 
(l) Commencing January 1, 2022, the minimum wage is twelve dollars and twenty-five 6 
cents ($12.25) per hour.  7 
(m) Commencing January 1, 2023, the minimum wage is thirteen dollars ($13.00) per hour. 8 
(n) Commencing January 1, 2024, the minimum wage is fourteen dollars ($14.00) per hour. 9 
(o) Commencing January 1, 2025, the minimum wage is fifteen dollars ($15.00) fifteen 10 
dollars and fifty cents ($15.50) per hour. 11 
(p) Commencing January 1, 2026, the minimum wage is seventeen dollars ($17.00) per 12 
hour. 13 
(q) Commencing January 1, 2027, the minimum wage is eighteen dollars and fifty cents 14 
($18.50) per hour. 15 
(r) Commencing January 1, 2028, the minimum wage is twenty dollars ($20.00) per hour. 16 
SECTION 2. This act shall take effect upon passage. 17 
======== 
LC002657 
========  
 
 
LC002657 - Page 3 of 3 
EXPLANATION 
BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL 
OF 
A N   A C T 
RELATING TO LABOR AND LABOR RELATIONS -- MINIMUM WAGES 
***
This act would raise the minimum wage for the years 2025, 2026, 2027 and 2028 to fifteen 1 
dollars and fifty cents ($15.50), seventeen dollars ($17.00), eighteen dollars and fifty cents 2 
($18.50), and twenty dollars ($20.00) per hour, respectively. 3 
This act would take effect upon passage. 4 
======== 
LC002657 
========