Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session

Rhode Island Senate Bill S0827 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22
33
44
55 2023 -- S 0827
66 ========
77 LC002656
88 ========
99 S TATE OF RHODE IS LAND
1010 IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY
1111 JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023
1212 ____________
1313
1414 A N A C T
1515 RELATING TO LABOR AND LABOR RELATIONS -- MINIMUM WAGES
1616 Introduced By: Senator Tiara T. Mack
1717 Date Introduced: March 23, 2023
1818 Referred To: Senate Labor
1919
2020
2121 It is enacted by the General Assembly as follows:
2222 SECTION 1. Section 28-12-3 of the General Laws in Chapter 28-12 entitled "Minimum 1
2323 Wages" is hereby amended to read as follows: 2
2424 28-12-3. Minimum wages. 3
2525 (a) Every employer shall pay to each of his or her employees: commencing July 1, 1999, 4
2626 at least the minimum wage of five dollars and sixty-five cents ($5.65) per hour. Commencing 5
2727 September 1, 2000, the minimum wage is six dollars and fifteen cents ($6.15) per hour. 6
2828 (b) Commencing January 1, 2004, the minimum wage is six dollars and seventy-five cents 7
2929 ($6.75) per hour. 8
3030 (c) Commencing March 1, 2006, the minimum wage is seven dollars and ten cents ($7.10) 9
3131 per hour. 10
3232 (d) Commencing January 1, 2007, the minimum wage is seven dollars and forty cents 11
3333 ($7.40) per hour. 12
3434 (e) Commencing January 1, 2013, the minimum wage is seven dollars and seventy-five 13
3535 cents ($7.75) per hour. 14
3636 (f) Commencing January 1, 2014, the minimum wage is eight dollars ($8.00) per hour. 15
3737 (g) Commencing January 1, 2015, the minimum wage is nine dollars ($9.00) per hour. 16
3838 (h) Commencing January 1, 2016, the minimum wage is nine dollars and sixty cents ($9.60) 17
3939 per hour. 18
4040 (i) Commencing January 1, 2018, the minimum wage is ten dollars and ten cents ($10.10) 19
4141
4242
4343 LC002656 - Page 2 of 3
4444 per hour. 1
4545 (j) Commencing January 1, 2019, the minimum wage is ten dollars and fifty cents ($10.50) 2
4646 per hour. 3
4747 (k) Commencing October 1, 2020, the minimum wage is eleven dollars and fifty cents 4
4848 ($11.50) per hour. 5
4949 (l) Commencing January 1, 2022, the minimum wage is twelve dollars and twenty-five 6
5050 cents ($12.25) per hour. 7
5151 (m) Commencing January 1, 2023, the minimum wage is thirteen dollars ($13.00) per hour. 8
5252 (n) Commencing January 1, 2024, the minimum wage is fourteen dollars ($14.00) per hour. 9
5353 (o) Commencing January 1, 2025, the minimum wage is fifteen dollars ($15.00) per hour. 10
5454 (p) Commencing January 1, 2026, and each January 1 thereafter, the minimum wage shall 11
5555 be adjusted by the increase, if any, in the cost of living. The increase in the cost of living shall be 12
5656 measured by the percentage increase, if any, as of August of the previous year over the level as of 13
5757 August of the year preceding that year in the Consumer Price Index for all Urban Consumers (CPI-14
5858 U), as published by the United States Department of Labor Statistics or its successor agency, with 15
5959 the amount of the minimum wage increase rounded to the nearest multiple of five cents ($.05). 16
6060 SECTION 2. This act shall take effect upon passage. 17
6161 ========
6262 LC002656
6363 ========
6464
6565
6666 LC002656 - Page 3 of 3
6767 EXPLANATION
6868 BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL
6969 OF
7070 A N A C T
7171 RELATING TO LABOR AND LABOR RELATIONS -- MINIMUM WAGES
7272 ***
7373 This act would raise the minimum wage on January 1, 2026, and each January 1, thereafter, 1
7474 by the percentage increase in the Consumer Price Index for all Urban Consumers (CPI-U), as 2
7575 published by the United States Department of Labor Statistics, in August of the previous year over 3
7676 the level as of August of the year preceding that year. 4
7777 This act would take effect upon passage. 5
7878 ========
7979 LC002656
8080 ========
8181