Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session

Rhode Island Senate Bill S0827 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/23/2023

                             
 
 
 
2023 -- S 0827 
======== 
LC002656 
======== 
S TATE  OF RHODE IS LAND 
IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY 
JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023 
____________ 
 
A N   A C T 
RELATING TO LABOR AND LABOR RELATIONS -- MINIMUM WAGES 
Introduced By: Senator Tiara T. Mack 
Date Introduced: March 23, 2023 
Referred To: Senate Labor 
 
 
It is enacted by the General Assembly as follows: 
SECTION 1. Section 28-12-3 of the General Laws in Chapter 28-12 entitled "Minimum 1 
Wages" is hereby amended to read as follows: 2 
28-12-3. Minimum wages. 3 
(a) Every employer shall pay to each of his or her employees: commencing July 1, 1999, 4 
at least the minimum wage of five dollars and sixty-five cents ($5.65) per hour. Commencing 5 
September 1, 2000, the minimum wage is six dollars and fifteen cents ($6.15) per hour. 6 
(b) Commencing January 1, 2004, the minimum wage is six dollars and seventy-five cents 7 
($6.75) per hour. 8 
(c) Commencing March 1, 2006, the minimum wage is seven dollars and ten cents ($7.10) 9 
per hour. 10 
(d) Commencing January 1, 2007, the minimum wage is seven dollars and forty cents 11 
($7.40) per hour. 12 
(e) Commencing January 1, 2013, the minimum wage is seven dollars and seventy-five 13 
cents ($7.75) per hour. 14 
(f) Commencing January 1, 2014, the minimum wage is eight dollars ($8.00) per hour. 15 
(g) Commencing January 1, 2015, the minimum wage is nine dollars ($9.00) per hour. 16 
(h) Commencing January 1, 2016, the minimum wage is nine dollars and sixty cents ($9.60) 17 
per hour. 18 
(i) Commencing January 1, 2018, the minimum wage is ten dollars and ten cents ($10.10) 19   
 
 
LC002656 - Page 2 of 3 
per hour. 1 
(j) Commencing January 1, 2019, the minimum wage is ten dollars and fifty cents ($10.50) 2 
per hour. 3 
(k) Commencing October 1, 2020, the minimum wage is eleven dollars and fifty cents 4 
($11.50) per hour. 5 
(l) Commencing January 1, 2022, the minimum wage is twelve dollars and twenty-five 6 
cents ($12.25) per hour.  7 
(m) Commencing January 1, 2023, the minimum wage is thirteen dollars ($13.00) per hour. 8 
(n) Commencing January 1, 2024, the minimum wage is fourteen dollars ($14.00) per hour. 9 
(o) Commencing January 1, 2025, the minimum wage is fifteen dollars ($15.00) per hour. 10 
(p) Commencing January 1, 2026, and each January 1 thereafter, the minimum wage shall 11 
be adjusted by the increase, if any, in the cost of living. The increase in the cost of living shall be 12 
measured by the percentage increase, if any, as of August of the previous year over the level as of 13 
August of the year preceding that year in the Consumer Price Index for all Urban Consumers (CPI-14 
U), as published by the United States Department of Labor Statistics or its successor agency, with 15 
the amount of the minimum wage increase rounded to the nearest multiple of five cents ($.05). 16 
SECTION 2. This act shall take effect upon passage. 17 
======== 
LC002656 
========  
 
 
LC002656 - Page 3 of 3 
EXPLANATION 
BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL 
OF 
A N   A C T 
RELATING TO LABOR AND LABOR RELATIONS -- MINIMUM WAGES 
***
This act would raise the minimum wage on January 1, 2026, and each January 1, thereafter, 1 
by the percentage increase in the Consumer Price Index for all Urban Consumers (CPI-U), as 2 
published by the United States Department of Labor Statistics, in August of the previous year over 3 
the level as of August of the year preceding that year. 4 
This act would take effect upon passage. 5 
======== 
LC002656 
========