Rhode Island 2025 Regular Session

Rhode Island House Bill H6269 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22
33
44
55 2025 -- H 6269
66 ========
77 LC002802
88 ========
99 S T A T E O F R H O D E I S L A N D
1010 IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY
1111 JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2025
1212 ____________
1313
1414 H O U S E R E S O L U T I O N
1515 EXTENDING THE REPORTING AND EXPIRATION DATES OF THE SPECIAL
1616 LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO STUDY AND MAKE RECOMMENDATIONS FOR A
1717 PLAN AND THE DESIGN OF A VIETNAM MEMORIA L TO BE LOCATED IN THE CITY
1818 OF PROVIDENCE, RHODE ISLAND
1919 Introduced By: Representatives Azzinaro, Fellela, J. Lombardi, Shallcross Smith,
2020 Santucci, Casimiro, Read, Costantino, and Lima
2121 Date Introduced: April 24, 2025
2222 Referred To: House Veterans` Affairs
2323
2424
2525 RESOLVED, That the special legislative commission created by resolution No. 237 1
2626 passed by the House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2022, and approved April 13, 2
2727 2022, entitled "House Resolution Creating a Special Legislative Commission to study and make 3
2828 recommendations for a plan and the design of a Vietnam Memorial to be located in the City of 4
2929 Providence, Rhode Island" and as extended by resolution No. 107 passed by the House of 5
3030 Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2023, and approved February 9, 2023, entitled 6
3131 "House Resolution extending the reporting and expiration dates of the Special Legislative 7
3232 Commission to study and make recommendations for a plan and the design of a Vietnam 8
3333 Memorial to be located in the City of Providence, Rhode Island" is hereby authorized to continue 9
3434 its study and make a report to the House of Representatives on or before January 31, 2028, and 10
3535 said commission shall expire on April 30, 2028; and be it further 11
3636 RESOLVED, That the time for reporting authorized by resolution No. 237 passed by the 12
3737 House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2022, and approved April 13, 2022, and as 13
3838 extended by resolution No.107 passed by the House of Representatives at its January session, 14
3939 A.D. 2023, and approved February 9, 2023, be and the same is hereby rescinded. 15
4040 ========
4141 LC002802
4242 ========
4343
4444
4545 LC002802 - Page 2 of 2
4646 EXPLANATION
4747 BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL
4848 OF
4949 H O U S E R E S O L U T I O N
5050 EXTENDING THE REPORT ING AND EXPIRATION DATES OF THE SPECIAL
5151 LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO STUDY AND MAKE RECOMMENDATIONS FOR A
5252 PLAN AND THE DESIGN OF A VIETNAM MEMORIA L TO BE LOCATED IN THE CITY
5353 OF PROVIDENCE, RHODE ISLAND
5454 ***
5555 This resolution would extend the reporting and expiration dates of the commission to 1
5656 study a plan and the design of a Vietnam Memorial in Providence, from January 31, 2025, to 2
5757 January 31, 2028, and said commission would expire on April 30, 2028. 3
5858 ========
5959 LC002802
6060 ========