Rhode Island 2025 Regular Session

Rhode Island House Bill H6269 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 04/24/2025

                             
 
 
 
2025 -- H 6269 
======== 
LC002802 
======== 
S T A T E O F R H O D E I S L A N D 
IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY 
JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2025 
____________ 
 
H O U S E   R E S O L U T I O N 
EXTENDING THE REPORTING AND EXPIRATION DATES OF THE SPECIAL 
LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO STUDY AND MAKE RECOMMENDATIONS FOR A 
PLAN AND THE DESIGN OF A VIETNAM MEMORIA L TO BE LOCATED IN THE CITY 
OF PROVIDENCE, RHODE ISLAND 
Introduced By: Representatives Azzinaro, Fellela, J. Lombardi, Shallcross Smith, 
Santucci, Casimiro, Read, Costantino, and Lima 
Date Introduced: April 24, 2025 
Referred To: House Veterans` Affairs 
 
 
RESOLVED, That the special legislative commission created by resolution No. 237 1 
passed by the House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2022, and approved April 13, 2 
2022, entitled "House Resolution Creating a Special Legislative Commission to study and make 3 
recommendations for a plan and the design of a Vietnam Memorial to be located in the City of 4 
Providence, Rhode Island" and as extended by resolution No. 107 passed by the House of 5 
Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2023, and approved February 9, 2023, entitled 6 
"House Resolution extending the reporting and expiration dates of the Special Legislative 7 
Commission to study and make recommendations for a plan and the design of a Vietnam 8 
Memorial to be located in the City of Providence, Rhode Island" is hereby authorized to continue 9 
its study and make a report to the House of Representatives on or before January 31, 2028, and 10 
said commission shall expire on April 30, 2028; and be it further 11 
RESOLVED, That the time for reporting authorized by resolution No. 237 passed by the 12 
House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2022, and approved April 13, 2022, and as 13 
extended by resolution No.107 passed by the House of Representatives at its January session, 14 
A.D. 2023, and approved February 9, 2023, be and the same is hereby rescinded. 15 
======== 
LC002802 
========  
 
 
LC002802 - Page 2 of 2 
EXPLANATION 
BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL 
OF 
H O U S E   R E S O L U T I O N 
EXTENDING THE REPORT ING AND EXPIRATION DATES OF THE SPECIAL 
LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO STUDY AND MAKE RECOMMENDATIONS FOR A 
PLAN AND THE DESIGN OF A VIETNAM MEMORIA L TO BE LOCATED IN THE CITY 
OF PROVIDENCE, RHODE ISLAND 
***
This resolution would extend the reporting and expiration dates of the commission to 1 
study a plan and the design of a Vietnam Memorial in Providence, from January 31, 2025, to 2 
January 31, 2028, and said commission would expire on April 30, 2028. 3 
======== 
LC002802 
========