2025 -- H 6285 ======== LC002820 ======== S T A T E O F R H O D E I S L A N D IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2025 ____________ H O U S E R E S O L U T I O N AMENDING THE MEMBERSHIP AND EXTEN DING THE REPORTING AND EXPIRATION DATES OF THE SPECIAL LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO STUDY HOUSING AFFORDABILITY Introduced By: Representative June Speakman Date Introduced: April 30, 2025 Referred To: House Municipal Government & Housing RESOLVED, That the special legislative commission created by resolution No. 140 and 1 passed by the House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2021, and approved March 3 2 25, 2021, entitled "House Resolution Creating a Special Legislative Commission to Study the 3 Low and Moderate Income Housing Act" and as amended by resolution No. 066 and passed by 4 the House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2022, and approved January 25, 2022, 5 entitled "House Resolution Extending the Reporting and Expiration Dates for the Special 6 Legislative Commission to Study the Low and Moderate Income Housing Act" and as amended 7 by resolution No. 229 and passed by the House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 8 2023, and approved April 6, 2023, entitled “House Resolution Extending the Reporting And 9 Expiration Dates and Amending the Purpose, Name, and Membership of the Special Legislative 10 Commission to Study The Low And Moderate Income Housing Act” is hereby authorized to 11 continue its study and make a report to the House of Representatives on or before June 5, 2027, 12 and said commission shall expire on June 26, 2027; and be it further 13 RESOLVED, That the time for reporting authorized by resolution No. 140 passed by the 14 House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2021, and approved March 25, 2021, and as 15 amended by resolution No. 066 passed by the House of Representatives at its January session, 16 A.D. 2022, and approved January 25, 2022, and as amended by resolution No. 229 passed by the 17 House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2023, and approved April 6, 2023, be and 18 the same is hereby rescinded; and be it further 19 LC002820 - Page 2 of 3 RESOLVED, The composition of said house commission is hereby increased from 1 eighteen (18) members to twenty (20) members by adding: one member who shall be the Rhode 2 Island Secretary of Housing, or designee; and one member who shall be the President and CEO of 3 United Way of Rhode Island, or designee. 4 ======== LC002820 ======== LC002820 - Page 3 of 3 EXPLANATION BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL OF H O U S E R E S O L U T I O N AMENDING THE MEMBERS HIP AND EXTENDING THE REPORTING AND EXPIRATION DATES OF THE SPECIAL LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO STUDY HOUSING AFFORDABILITY *** This resolution would increase the membership from eighteen (18) to twenty (20), and 1 extend the reporting and expiration dates of the Commission to Study Housing Affordability from 2 June 7, 2025, to June 5, 2027, and would expire on June 26, 2027. 3 ======== LC002820 ========