Rhode Island 2025 Regular Session

Rhode Island House Bill H6285 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 04/30/2025

                             
 
 
 
2025 -- H 6285 
======== 
LC002820 
======== 
S T A T E O F R H O D E I S L A N D 
IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY 
JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2025 
____________ 
 
H O U S E   R E S O L U T I O N 
AMENDING THE MEMBERSHIP AND EXTEN DING THE REPORTING AND 
EXPIRATION DATES OF THE SPECIAL LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO STUDY 
HOUSING AFFORDABILITY 
Introduced By: Representative June Speakman 
Date Introduced: April 30, 2025 
Referred To: House Municipal Government & Housing 
 
 
RESOLVED, That the special legislative commission created by resolution No. 140 and 1 
passed by the House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2021, and approved March 3 2 
25, 2021, entitled "House Resolution Creating a Special Legislative Commission to Study the 3 
Low and Moderate Income Housing Act" and as amended by resolution No. 066 and passed by 4 
the House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2022, and approved January 25, 2022, 5 
entitled "House Resolution Extending the Reporting and Expiration Dates for the Special 6 
Legislative Commission to Study the Low and Moderate Income Housing Act"  and as amended 7 
by resolution No. 229 and passed by the House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 8 
2023, and approved April 6, 2023, entitled “House Resolution Extending the Reporting And 9 
Expiration Dates and Amending the Purpose, Name, and Membership of the Special Legislative 10 
Commission to Study The Low And Moderate Income Housing Act” is hereby authorized to 11 
continue its study and make a report to the House of Representatives on or before June 5, 2027, 12 
and said commission shall expire on June 26, 2027; and be it further 13 
RESOLVED, That the time for reporting authorized by resolution No. 140 passed by the 14 
House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2021, and approved March 25, 2021, and as 15 
amended by resolution No. 066 passed by the House of Representatives at its January session, 16 
A.D. 2022, and approved January 25, 2022, and as amended by resolution No. 229 passed by the 17 
House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2023, and approved April 6, 2023, be and 18 
the same is hereby rescinded; and be it further  19   
 
 
LC002820 - Page 2 of 3 
RESOLVED, The composition of said house commission is hereby increased from 1 
eighteen (18) members to twenty (20) members by adding: one member who shall be the Rhode 2 
Island Secretary of Housing, or designee; and one member who shall be the President and CEO of 3 
United Way of Rhode Island, or designee. 4 
======== 
LC002820 
========  
 
 
LC002820 - Page 3 of 3 
EXPLANATION 
BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL 
OF 
H O U S E   R E S O L U T I O N 
AMENDING THE MEMBERS HIP AND EXTENDING THE REPORTING AND 
EXPIRATION DATES OF THE SPECIAL LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO STUDY 
HOUSING AFFORDABILITY 
***
This resolution would increase the membership from eighteen (18) to twenty (20), and 1 
extend the reporting and expiration dates of the Commission to Study Housing Affordability from 2 
June 7, 2025, to June 5, 2027, and would expire on June 26, 2027. 3 
======== 
LC002820 
========