1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | 2025 -- H 6285 |
---|
6 | 6 | | ======== |
---|
7 | 7 | | LC002820 |
---|
8 | 8 | | ======== |
---|
9 | 9 | | S T A T E O F R H O D E I S L A N D |
---|
10 | 10 | | IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY |
---|
11 | 11 | | JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2025 |
---|
12 | 12 | | ____________ |
---|
13 | 13 | | |
---|
14 | 14 | | H O U S E R E S O L U T I O N |
---|
15 | 15 | | AMENDING THE MEMBERSHIP AND EXTEN DING THE REPORTING AND |
---|
16 | 16 | | EXPIRATION DATES OF THE SPECIAL LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO STUDY |
---|
17 | 17 | | HOUSING AFFORDABILITY |
---|
18 | 18 | | Introduced By: Representative June Speakman |
---|
19 | 19 | | Date Introduced: April 30, 2025 |
---|
20 | 20 | | Referred To: House Municipal Government & Housing |
---|
21 | 21 | | |
---|
22 | 22 | | |
---|
23 | 23 | | RESOLVED, That the special legislative commission created by resolution No. 140 and 1 |
---|
24 | 24 | | passed by the House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2021, and approved March 3 2 |
---|
25 | 25 | | 25, 2021, entitled "House Resolution Creating a Special Legislative Commission to Study the 3 |
---|
26 | 26 | | Low and Moderate Income Housing Act" and as amended by resolution No. 066 and passed by 4 |
---|
27 | 27 | | the House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2022, and approved January 25, 2022, 5 |
---|
28 | 28 | | entitled "House Resolution Extending the Reporting and Expiration Dates for the Special 6 |
---|
29 | 29 | | Legislative Commission to Study the Low and Moderate Income Housing Act" and as amended 7 |
---|
30 | 30 | | by resolution No. 229 and passed by the House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 8 |
---|
31 | 31 | | 2023, and approved April 6, 2023, entitled “House Resolution Extending the Reporting And 9 |
---|
32 | 32 | | Expiration Dates and Amending the Purpose, Name, and Membership of the Special Legislative 10 |
---|
33 | 33 | | Commission to Study The Low And Moderate Income Housing Act” is hereby authorized to 11 |
---|
34 | 34 | | continue its study and make a report to the House of Representatives on or before June 5, 2027, 12 |
---|
35 | 35 | | and said commission shall expire on June 26, 2027; and be it further 13 |
---|
36 | 36 | | RESOLVED, That the time for reporting authorized by resolution No. 140 passed by the 14 |
---|
37 | 37 | | House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2021, and approved March 25, 2021, and as 15 |
---|
38 | 38 | | amended by resolution No. 066 passed by the House of Representatives at its January session, 16 |
---|
39 | 39 | | A.D. 2022, and approved January 25, 2022, and as amended by resolution No. 229 passed by the 17 |
---|
40 | 40 | | House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2023, and approved April 6, 2023, be and 18 |
---|
41 | 41 | | the same is hereby rescinded; and be it further 19 |
---|
42 | 42 | | |
---|
43 | 43 | | |
---|
44 | 44 | | LC002820 - Page 2 of 3 |
---|
45 | 45 | | RESOLVED, The composition of said house commission is hereby increased from 1 |
---|
46 | 46 | | eighteen (18) members to twenty (20) members by adding: one member who shall be the Rhode 2 |
---|
47 | 47 | | Island Secretary of Housing, or designee; and one member who shall be the President and CEO of 3 |
---|
48 | 48 | | United Way of Rhode Island, or designee. 4 |
---|
49 | 49 | | ======== |
---|
50 | 50 | | LC002820 |
---|
51 | 51 | | ======== |
---|
52 | 52 | | |
---|
53 | 53 | | |
---|
54 | 54 | | LC002820 - Page 3 of 3 |
---|
55 | 55 | | EXPLANATION |
---|
56 | 56 | | BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL |
---|
57 | 57 | | OF |
---|
58 | 58 | | H O U S E R E S O L U T I O N |
---|
59 | 59 | | AMENDING THE MEMBERS HIP AND EXTENDING THE REPORTING AND |
---|
60 | 60 | | EXPIRATION DATES OF THE SPECIAL LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO STUDY |
---|
61 | 61 | | HOUSING AFFORDABILITY |
---|
62 | 62 | | *** |
---|
63 | 63 | | This resolution would increase the membership from eighteen (18) to twenty (20), and 1 |
---|
64 | 64 | | extend the reporting and expiration dates of the Commission to Study Housing Affordability from 2 |
---|
65 | 65 | | June 7, 2025, to June 5, 2027, and would expire on June 26, 2027. 3 |
---|
66 | 66 | | ======== |
---|
67 | 67 | | LC002820 |
---|
68 | 68 | | ======== |
---|