1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | 2025 -- H 6288 |
---|
6 | 6 | | ======== |
---|
7 | 7 | | LC002819 |
---|
8 | 8 | | ======== |
---|
9 | 9 | | S T A T E O F R H O D E I S L A N D |
---|
10 | 10 | | IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY |
---|
11 | 11 | | JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2025 |
---|
12 | 12 | | ____________ |
---|
13 | 13 | | |
---|
14 | 14 | | H O U S E R E S O L U T I O N |
---|
15 | 15 | | EXTENDING THE REPORTING AND EXPIRATION DATES OF THE SPECIAL |
---|
16 | 16 | | LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO STUDY AND REVIEW THE COST AND STATUS OF |
---|
17 | 17 | | THE STATE OF RHODE ISLAND OWNED, VACANT, AND ABANDONED PROPE RTIES |
---|
18 | 18 | | AND PROVIDE RECOMMEN DATIONS FOR METHODS TO MITIGATE THE |
---|
19 | 19 | | ASSOCIATED EXPENSES |
---|
20 | 20 | | Introduced By: Representative Thomas E. Noret |
---|
21 | 21 | | Date Introduced: April 30, 2025 |
---|
22 | 22 | | Referred To: House State Government & Elections |
---|
23 | 23 | | |
---|
24 | 24 | | |
---|
25 | 25 | | RESOLVED, That the special legislative commission created by resolution No. 295 1 |
---|
26 | 26 | | passed by the House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2022, and approved May 12, 2 |
---|
27 | 27 | | 2022, entitled "House Resolution Creating a Special Legislative Commission to Study and 3 |
---|
28 | 28 | | Review the Cost and Status of the State of Rhode Island Owned, Vacant, and Abandoned 4 |
---|
29 | 29 | | Properties and Provide Recommendations for Methods to Mitigate the Associated Expenses" and 5 |
---|
30 | 30 | | as extended by resolution No. 341 passed by the House of Representatives at its January session, 6 |
---|
31 | 31 | | A.D. 2023, and approved May 23, 2023, entitled "House Resolution Extending the Reporting and 7 |
---|
32 | 32 | | Expiration Dates of the Special Legislative Commission to Study and Review the Cost and Status 8 |
---|
33 | 33 | | of the State of Rhode Island Owned, Vacant, and Abandoned Properties and Provide 9 |
---|
34 | 34 | | Recommendations for Methods to Mitigate the Associated Expenses" and as extended by 10 |
---|
35 | 35 | | resolution No. 371 passed by the House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2024, and 11 |
---|
36 | 36 | | approved June 10, 2024, entitled "House Resolution Extending the Reporting and Expiration 12 |
---|
37 | 37 | | Dates of the Special Legislative Commission to Study and Review the Cost and Status of the 13 |
---|
38 | 38 | | State of Rhode Island Owned, Vacant, and Abandoned Properties and Provide Recommendations 14 |
---|
39 | 39 | | for Methods to Mitigate the Associated Expenses" is hereby authorized to continue its study and 15 |
---|
40 | 40 | | make a report to the House of Representatives on or before May 24, 2026, and said commission 16 |
---|
41 | 41 | | shall expire on December 15, 2026; and be it further 17 |
---|
42 | 42 | | RESOLVED, That the time for reporting authorized by resolution No. 371 passed by the 18 |
---|
43 | 43 | | |
---|
44 | 44 | | |
---|
45 | 45 | | LC002819 - Page 2 of 3 |
---|
46 | 46 | | House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2024, and approved June 10, 2024, be and 1 |
---|
47 | 47 | | the same is hereby rescinded. 2 |
---|
48 | 48 | | ======== |
---|
49 | 49 | | LC002819 |
---|
50 | 50 | | ======== |
---|
51 | 51 | | |
---|
52 | 52 | | |
---|
53 | 53 | | LC002819 - Page 3 of 3 |
---|
54 | 54 | | EXPLANATION |
---|
55 | 55 | | BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL |
---|
56 | 56 | | OF |
---|
57 | 57 | | H O U S E R E S O L U T I O N |
---|
58 | 58 | | EXTENDING THE REPORT ING AND EXPIRATION DATES OF THE SPECIAL |
---|
59 | 59 | | LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO STUDY AND REVIEW THE COST AND STATUS OF |
---|
60 | 60 | | THE STATE OF RHODE ISLAND OWNED, VACANT, AND ABANDONED PROPE RTIES |
---|
61 | 61 | | AND PROVIDE RECOMMEN DATIONS FOR METHODS TO MITIGATE THE |
---|
62 | 62 | | ASSOCIATED EXPENSES |
---|
63 | 63 | | *** |
---|
64 | 64 | | This resolution would extend the reporting and expiration dates of the Commission to 1 |
---|
65 | 65 | | review the cost and status of State owned, vacant, and abandoned properties and make 2 |
---|
66 | 66 | | recommendations to mitigate expenses to May 24, 2026, and would expire December 15, 2026. 3 |
---|
67 | 67 | | ======== |
---|
68 | 68 | | LC002819 |
---|
69 | 69 | | ======== |
---|