Rhode Island 2025 Regular Session

Rhode Island House Bill H6288 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 04/30/2025

                             
 
 
 
2025 -- H 6288 
======== 
LC002819 
======== 
S T A T E O F R H O D E I S L A N D 
IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY 
JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2025 
____________ 
 
H O U S E   R E S O L U T I O N 
EXTENDING THE REPORTING AND EXPIRATION DATES OF THE SPECIAL 
LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO STUDY AND REVIEW THE COST AND STATUS OF 
THE STATE OF RHODE ISLAND OWNED, VACANT, AND ABANDONED PROPE RTIES 
AND PROVIDE RECOMMEN DATIONS FOR METHODS TO MITIGATE THE 
ASSOCIATED EXPENSES 
Introduced By: Representative Thomas E. Noret 
Date Introduced: April 30, 2025 
Referred To: House State Government & Elections 
 
 
RESOLVED, That the special legislative commission created by resolution No. 295 1 
passed by the House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2022, and approved May 12, 2 
2022, entitled "House Resolution Creating a Special Legislative Commission to Study and 3 
Review the Cost and Status of the State of Rhode Island Owned, Vacant, and Abandoned 4 
Properties and Provide Recommendations for Methods to Mitigate the Associated Expenses" and 5 
as extended by resolution No. 341 passed by the House of Representatives at its January session, 6 
A.D. 2023, and approved May 23, 2023, entitled "House Resolution Extending the Reporting and 7 
Expiration Dates of the Special Legislative Commission to Study and Review the Cost and Status 8 
of the State of Rhode Island Owned, Vacant, and Abandoned Properties and Provide 9 
Recommendations for Methods to Mitigate the Associated Expenses" and as extended by 10 
resolution No. 371 passed by the House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2024, and 11 
approved June 10, 2024, entitled "House Resolution Extending the Reporting and Expiration 12 
Dates of the Special Legislative Commission to Study and Review the Cost and Status of the 13 
State of Rhode Island Owned, Vacant, and Abandoned Properties and Provide Recommendations 14 
for Methods to Mitigate the Associated Expenses" is hereby authorized to continue its study and 15 
make a report to the House of Representatives on or before May 24, 2026, and said commission 16 
shall expire on December 15, 2026; and be it further  17 
RESOLVED, That the time for reporting authorized by resolution No. 371 passed by the 18   
 
 
LC002819 - Page 2 of 3 
House of Representatives at its January session, A.D. 2024, and approved June 10, 2024, be and 1 
the same is hereby rescinded.  2 
======== 
LC002819 
========  
 
 
LC002819 - Page 3 of 3 
EXPLANATION 
BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL 
OF 
H O U S E   R E S O L U T I O N 
EXTENDING THE REPORT ING AND EXPIRATION DATES OF THE SPECIAL 
LEGISLATIVE COMMISSION TO STUDY AND REVIEW THE COST AND STATUS OF 
THE STATE OF RHODE ISLAND OWNED, VACANT, AND ABANDONED PROPE RTIES 
AND PROVIDE RECOMMEN DATIONS FOR METHODS TO MITIGATE THE 
ASSOCIATED EXPENSES 
***
This resolution would extend the reporting and expiration dates of the Commission to 1 
review the cost and status of State owned, vacant, and abandoned properties and make 2 
recommendations to mitigate expenses to May 24, 2026, and would expire December 15, 2026. 3 
======== 
LC002819 
========