South Carolina 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

South Carolina House Bill H4446 Introduced / Bill

Filed 04/30/2025

                    South Carolina General Assembly126th Session, 2025-2026

Bill 4446

Indicates Matter StrickenIndicates New Matter

(Text matches printed bills. Document has been reformatted to meet World Wide Web specifications.)

A concurrent RESOLUTION   To request the Department of Transportation name the portion of Powell Road in Georgetown County from its intersection with Singleton Road to Harold Road "Deputy Sheriff Leroy Gasque Sr. Memorial Highway" and erect appropriate markers or signs containing these words.   Whereas, Deputy Sheriff Leroy Gasque Sr. was born on October 30, 1935, the son of the late Mr. Troy Gasque and the late Mrs. Lena White Gasque. He departed his earthly life on July 14, 2004; and   Whereas, he attended the public schools of Georgetown County and graduated from Rosemary High School in Andrews in 1957. He later graduated from the South Carolina Law Enforcement Academy; and   Whereas, at an early age, he joined St. Paul A.M.E. Church and accepted Christ as his personal savior. He was a faithful member of St. Paul and served as leader of Class #2, church secretary, member of the Four Gospels Jubilee Singers, male chorus, senior choir, and served as church custodian; and   Whereas, on December 15, 1963, he was united in holy matrimony to Miss Willie Henderson. Their union was blessed with the birth of four children; and   Whereas, for twenty-seven years he worked for the Georgetown County Sheriff's Office where he served as an auxiliary policeman before becoming a deputy sheriff; and   Whereas, it would be fitting and proper to name a portion of highway in Georgetown County in honor of this son of South Carolina. Now, therefore,   Be it resolved by the House of Representatives, the Senate concurring:   That the members of the South Carolina General Assembly, by this resolution, request the Department of Transportation name the portion of Powell Road in Georgetown County from its intersection with Singleton Road to Harold Road "Deputy Sheriff Leroy Gasque Sr. Memorial Highway" and erect appropriate markers or signs containing these words.   Be it further resolved that a copy of this resolution be forwarded to the Department of Transportation. ----XX---

A concurrent RESOLUTION

To request the Department of Transportation name the portion of Powell Road in Georgetown County from its intersection with Singleton Road to Harold Road "Deputy Sheriff Leroy Gasque Sr. Memorial Highway" and erect appropriate markers or signs containing these words.

Whereas, Deputy Sheriff Leroy Gasque Sr. was born on October 30, 1935, the son of the late Mr. Troy Gasque and the late Mrs. Lena White Gasque. He departed his earthly life on July 14, 2004; and

Whereas, he attended the public schools of Georgetown County and graduated from Rosemary High School in Andrews in 1957. He later graduated from the South Carolina Law Enforcement Academy; and

Whereas, at an early age, he joined St. Paul A.M.E. Church and accepted Christ as his personal savior. He was a faithful member of St. Paul and served as leader of Class #2, church secretary, member of the Four Gospels Jubilee Singers, male chorus, senior choir, and served as church custodian; and

Whereas, on December 15, 1963, he was united in holy matrimony to Miss Willie Henderson. Their union was blessed with the birth of four children; and

Whereas, for twenty-seven years he worked for the Georgetown County Sheriff's Office where he served as an auxiliary policeman before becoming a deputy sheriff; and

Whereas, it would be fitting and proper to name a portion of highway in Georgetown County in honor of this son of South Carolina. Now, therefore,

Be it resolved by the House of Representatives, the Senate concurring:

That the members of the South Carolina General Assembly, by this resolution, request the Department of Transportation name the portion of Powell Road in Georgetown County from its intersection with Singleton Road to Harold Road "Deputy Sheriff Leroy Gasque Sr. Memorial Highway" and erect appropriate markers or signs containing these words.

Be it further resolved that a copy of this resolution be forwarded to the Department of Transportation.

----XX---

This web page was last updated on April 30, 2025 at 11:52 AM