South Carolina General Assembly126th Session, 2025-2026 (Text matches printed bills. Document has been reformatted to meet World Wide Web specifications.) Committee Report May 1, 2025 H. 4446 Introduced by Reps. Anderson and Hewitt S. Printed 5/1/25--H. Read the first time April 30, 2025 ________ The committee on House Invitations and Memorial Resolutions To whom was referred a Concurrent Resolution (H. 4446) to request the Department of Transportation name the portion of Powell Road in Georgetown County from its intersection with Singleton Road to Harold Road, etc., respectfully Report: That they have duly and carefully considered the same, and recommend that the same do pass: DENNIS MOSS for Committee. _______ A concurrent RESOLUTION To request the Department of Transportation name the portion of Powell Road in Georgetown County from its intersection with Singleton Road to Harold Road "Deputy Sheriff Leroy Gasque Sr. Memorial Highway" and erect appropriate markers or signs containing these words. Whereas, Deputy Sheriff Leroy Gasque Sr. was born on October 30, 1935, the son of the late Mr. Troy Gasque and the late Mrs. Lena White Gasque. He departed his earthly life on July 14, 2004; and Whereas, he attended the public schools of Georgetown County and graduated from Rosemary High School in Andrews in 1957. He later graduated from the South Carolina Law Enforcement Academy; and Whereas, at an early age, he joined St. Paul A.M.E. Church and accepted Christ as his personal savior. He was a faithful member of St. Paul and served as leader of Class #2, church secretary, member of the Four Gospels Jubilee Singers, male chorus, senior choir, and served as church custodian; and Whereas, on December 15, 1963, he was united in holy matrimony to Miss Willie Henderson. Their union was blessed with the birth of four children; and Whereas, for twenty-seven years he worked for the Georgetown County Sheriff's Office where he served as an auxiliary policeman before becoming a deputy sheriff; and Whereas, it would be fitting and proper to name a portion of highway in Georgetown County in honor of this son of South Carolina. Now, therefore, Be it resolved by the House of Representatives, the Senate concurring: That the members of the South Carolina General Assembly, by this resolution, request the Department of Transportation name the portion of Powell Road in Georgetown County from its intersection with Singleton Road to Harold Road "Deputy Sheriff Leroy Gasque Sr. Memorial Highway" and erect appropriate markers or signs containing these words. Be it further resolved that a copy of this resolution be forwarded to the Department of Transportation. ----XX--- Committee Report May 1, 2025 H. 4446 Introduced by Reps. Anderson and Hewitt S. Printed 5/1/25--H. Read the first time April 30, 2025 ________ The committee on House Invitations and Memorial Resolutions To whom was referred a Concurrent Resolution (H. 4446) to request the Department of Transportation name the portion of Powell Road in Georgetown County from its intersection with Singleton Road to Harold Road, etc., respectfully Report: That they have duly and carefully considered the same, and recommend that the same do pass: DENNIS MOSS for Committee. _______ A concurrent RESOLUTION To request the Department of Transportation name the portion of Powell Road in Georgetown County from its intersection with Singleton Road to Harold Road "Deputy Sheriff Leroy Gasque Sr. Memorial Highway" and erect appropriate markers or signs containing these words. Whereas, Deputy Sheriff Leroy Gasque Sr. was born on October 30, 1935, the son of the late Mr. Troy Gasque and the late Mrs. Lena White Gasque. He departed his earthly life on July 14, 2004; and Whereas, he attended the public schools of Georgetown County and graduated from Rosemary High School in Andrews in 1957. He later graduated from the South Carolina Law Enforcement Academy; and Whereas, at an early age, he joined St. Paul A.M.E. Church and accepted Christ as his personal savior. He was a faithful member of St. Paul and served as leader of Class #2, church secretary, member of the Four Gospels Jubilee Singers, male chorus, senior choir, and served as church custodian; and Whereas, on December 15, 1963, he was united in holy matrimony to Miss Willie Henderson. Their union was blessed with the birth of four children; and Whereas, for twenty-seven years he worked for the Georgetown County Sheriff's Office where he served as an auxiliary policeman before becoming a deputy sheriff; and Whereas, it would be fitting and proper to name a portion of highway in Georgetown County in honor of this son of South Carolina. Now, therefore, Be it resolved by the House of Representatives, the Senate concurring: That the members of the South Carolina General Assembly, by this resolution, request the Department of Transportation name the portion of Powell Road in Georgetown County from its intersection with Singleton Road to Harold Road "Deputy Sheriff Leroy Gasque Sr. Memorial Highway" and erect appropriate markers or signs containing these words. Be it further resolved that a copy of this resolution be forwarded to the Department of Transportation. ----XX--- This web page was last updated on May 01, 2025 at 07:57 PM