South Carolina 2025-2026 Regular Session

South Carolina House Bill H4446 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 South Carolina General Assembly126th Session, 2025-2026
2+
3+Bill 4446
4+
5+Indicates Matter StrickenIndicates New Matter
26
37 (Text matches printed bills. Document has been reformatted to meet World Wide Web specifications.)
48
5-Committee Report May 1, 2025 H. 4446 Introduced by Reps. Anderson and Hewitt S. Printed 5/1/25--H. Read the first time April 30, 2025 ________ The committee on House Invitations and Memorial Resolutions To whom was referred a Concurrent Resolution (H. 4446) to request the Department of Transportation name the portion of Powell Road in Georgetown County from its intersection with Singleton Road to Harold Road, etc., respectfully Report: That they have duly and carefully considered the same, and recommend that the same do pass: DENNIS MOSS for Committee. _______ A concurrent RESOLUTION To request the Department of Transportation name the portion of Powell Road in Georgetown County from its intersection with Singleton Road to Harold Road "Deputy Sheriff Leroy Gasque Sr. Memorial Highway" and erect appropriate markers or signs containing these words. Whereas, Deputy Sheriff Leroy Gasque Sr. was born on October 30, 1935, the son of the late Mr. Troy Gasque and the late Mrs. Lena White Gasque. He departed his earthly life on July 14, 2004; and Whereas, he attended the public schools of Georgetown County and graduated from Rosemary High School in Andrews in 1957. He later graduated from the South Carolina Law Enforcement Academy; and Whereas, at an early age, he joined St. Paul A.M.E. Church and accepted Christ as his personal savior. He was a faithful member of St. Paul and served as leader of Class #2, church secretary, member of the Four Gospels Jubilee Singers, male chorus, senior choir, and served as church custodian; and Whereas, on December 15, 1963, he was united in holy matrimony to Miss Willie Henderson. Their union was blessed with the birth of four children; and Whereas, for twenty-seven years he worked for the Georgetown County Sheriff's Office where he served as an auxiliary policeman before becoming a deputy sheriff; and Whereas, it would be fitting and proper to name a portion of highway in Georgetown County in honor of this son of South Carolina. Now, therefore, Be it resolved by the House of Representatives, the Senate concurring: That the members of the South Carolina General Assembly, by this resolution, request the Department of Transportation name the portion of Powell Road in Georgetown County from its intersection with Singleton Road to Harold Road "Deputy Sheriff Leroy Gasque Sr. Memorial Highway" and erect appropriate markers or signs containing these words. Be it further resolved that a copy of this resolution be forwarded to the Department of Transportation. ----XX---
6-
7-Committee Report
8-
9-May 1, 2025
10-
11-H. 4446
12-
13-Introduced by Reps. Anderson and Hewitt
14-
15-S. Printed 5/1/25--H.
16-
17-Read the first time April 30, 2025
18-
19-________
20-
21-The committee on House Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
22-
23-To whom was referred a Concurrent Resolution (H. 4446) to request the Department of Transportation name the portion of Powell Road in Georgetown County from its intersection with Singleton Road to Harold Road, etc., respectfully
24-
25-Report:
26-
27-That they have duly and carefully considered the same, and recommend that the same do pass:
28-
29-DENNIS MOSS for Committee.
30-
31-_______
9+A concurrent RESOLUTION To request the Department of Transportation name the portion of Powell Road in Georgetown County from its intersection with Singleton Road to Harold Road "Deputy Sheriff Leroy Gasque Sr. Memorial Highway" and erect appropriate markers or signs containing these words. Whereas, Deputy Sheriff Leroy Gasque Sr. was born on October 30, 1935, the son of the late Mr. Troy Gasque and the late Mrs. Lena White Gasque. He departed his earthly life on July 14, 2004; and Whereas, he attended the public schools of Georgetown County and graduated from Rosemary High School in Andrews in 1957. He later graduated from the South Carolina Law Enforcement Academy; and Whereas, at an early age, he joined St. Paul A.M.E. Church and accepted Christ as his personal savior. He was a faithful member of St. Paul and served as leader of Class #2, church secretary, member of the Four Gospels Jubilee Singers, male chorus, senior choir, and served as church custodian; and Whereas, on December 15, 1963, he was united in holy matrimony to Miss Willie Henderson. Their union was blessed with the birth of four children; and Whereas, for twenty-seven years he worked for the Georgetown County Sheriff's Office where he served as an auxiliary policeman before becoming a deputy sheriff; and Whereas, it would be fitting and proper to name a portion of highway in Georgetown County in honor of this son of South Carolina. Now, therefore, Be it resolved by the House of Representatives, the Senate concurring: That the members of the South Carolina General Assembly, by this resolution, request the Department of Transportation name the portion of Powell Road in Georgetown County from its intersection with Singleton Road to Harold Road "Deputy Sheriff Leroy Gasque Sr. Memorial Highway" and erect appropriate markers or signs containing these words. Be it further resolved that a copy of this resolution be forwarded to the Department of Transportation. ----XX---
3210
3311 A concurrent RESOLUTION
3412
3513 To request the Department of Transportation name the portion of Powell Road in Georgetown County from its intersection with Singleton Road to Harold Road "Deputy Sheriff Leroy Gasque Sr. Memorial Highway" and erect appropriate markers or signs containing these words.
3614
3715 Whereas, Deputy Sheriff Leroy Gasque Sr. was born on October 30, 1935, the son of the late Mr. Troy Gasque and the late Mrs. Lena White Gasque. He departed his earthly life on July 14, 2004; and
3816
3917 Whereas, he attended the public schools of Georgetown County and graduated from Rosemary High School in Andrews in 1957. He later graduated from the South Carolina Law Enforcement Academy; and
4018
4119 Whereas, at an early age, he joined St. Paul A.M.E. Church and accepted Christ as his personal savior. He was a faithful member of St. Paul and served as leader of Class #2, church secretary, member of the Four Gospels Jubilee Singers, male chorus, senior choir, and served as church custodian; and
4220
4321 Whereas, on December 15, 1963, he was united in holy matrimony to Miss Willie Henderson. Their union was blessed with the birth of four children; and
4422
4523 Whereas, for twenty-seven years he worked for the Georgetown County Sheriff's Office where he served as an auxiliary policeman before becoming a deputy sheriff; and
4624
4725 Whereas, it would be fitting and proper to name a portion of highway in Georgetown County in honor of this son of South Carolina. Now, therefore,
4826
4927 Be it resolved by the House of Representatives, the Senate concurring:
5028
5129 That the members of the South Carolina General Assembly, by this resolution, request the Department of Transportation name the portion of Powell Road in Georgetown County from its intersection with Singleton Road to Harold Road "Deputy Sheriff Leroy Gasque Sr. Memorial Highway" and erect appropriate markers or signs containing these words.
5230
5331 Be it further resolved that a copy of this resolution be forwarded to the Department of Transportation.
5432
5533 ----XX---
5634
57-This web page was last updated on May 01, 2025 at 07:57 PM
35+This web page was last updated on April 30, 2025 at 11:52 AM