House
|
02/19/2025
|
Signed by the Governor on February 19, 2025 H.J. 318
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2025
|
Delivered to the Governor on February 12, 2025 H.J. 262
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2025
|
Signed by the President S.J. 241
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2025
|
Signed by the Speaker H.J. 245
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2025
|
Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 210
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Certified uncontested, placed on consent
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
Retirement Laws Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 0.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2025
|
Referred to Senate Retirement Laws S.J. 143
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2025
|
First Reading Senate S.J. 112
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2025
|
House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 121
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2025
|
House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 114
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2025
|
Scheduled for hearing
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2025
|
First read in House and referred to House Retirement Laws H.J. 13
|
|
|