House
|
03/31/2025
|
Signed by the Governor on March 31, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Delivered to the Governor on March 12, 2025 H.J. 528
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Signed by the President S.J. 512
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2025
|
Signed by the Speaker H.J. 510
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 471
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2025
|
Certified uncontested, placed on consent
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2025
|
Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2025
|
Scheduled for hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2025
|
First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 354
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2025
|
House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 363
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2025
|
Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2025
|
First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 197
|
|
|