|
04/29/2025
|
Comp. became Pub. Ch. 230
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Sponsor(s) Added.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Comp. SB subst.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/7/2025
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/3/2025
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/1/2025
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/26/2025
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/18/2025
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2025
|
Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/11/2025
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2025
|
Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2025
|
P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2025
|
Intro., P1C.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2025
|
Filed for introduction
|
|
|