Tennessee 2025-2026 Regular Session

Tennessee House Bill HB1129 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 04/25/2025

                            " 	''/~ 
: 	-' ; ~., :-::i e • ' l'RI' )' ~-'i• 
: ( :~: 
..... 
J enne&see Senate 
PUBLIC CHAPTER NO. 230 
SENATE BILL NO. 915 
By Bailey, Bowling, Hatcher, Rose, Southerland 
Substituted for: House Bill No. 1129 
By Farmer, Hale, Bricken, Littleton, Davis, Alexander 
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 54, Chapter 1, relative to disaster-related 
exemptions. 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF TENNESSEE: 
SECTION 1. Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 54-1-128, is amended by adding the 
following as a new subsection: 
(e) Notwithstanding this section, the restrictions on borrow pits under subdivisions 
(b)(1 ){A), (D) and (E) do not apply to temporary borrow pits used for a road work construction 
project performed in a FEMA-certified county under a contract for construction work entered 
into with the state that is part of a state or local Hurricane Helene recovery effort. For 
purposes of this subsection ( e ), "FE MA-certified county" means a county included in a 
declaration made on or after September 26, 2024, and prior to October 3, 2024, for a 
disaster certified by the federal emergency management agency (FEMA). Notwithstanding 
another law to the contrary, this subsection (e) expires on June 30, 2039. 
SECTION 2. This act takes effect upon becoming a law, the public welfare requiring it.  PASSED: 
SENATE BILL NO. 915 
April 7, 2025 
RANDY MctfALL Y 
SPEAKER OF THE SENATE 
• I.A~ 
CAMERON SEXTON, SPEAKER 
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES 
APPROVED this ;}.. I~ day of /Jrpr{ I 2025 
BILL LEE, GOVERNOR