House
|
04/30/2025
|
Signed by H. Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2025
|
Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2025
|
Passed H., as am., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2025
|
H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0463)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/21/2025
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2025
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 4/16/2025
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Action def. in State & Local Government Committee to 4/16/2025
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 4/9/2025
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Action def. in State & Local Government Committee to 4/9/2025
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 4/2/2025
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2025
|
Rec. for pass; ref to State & Local Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Placed on cal. Private Acts Committee for 3/17/2025
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2025
|
P2C, ref. to Private Acts Committee - State & Local Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Intro., P1C.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2025
|
Filed for introduction
|
|
|