LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Tennessee TN
Legislatures
2025-2026 Regular Session
House
Bills
HJR0355
Action History
TN
Tennessee House Bill HJR0355
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Tennessee 2025-2026 Regular Session
Tennessee House Bill HJR0355
Action History
Senate
03/20/2025
Received from House, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee
House
03/18/2025
Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
House
03/17/2025
Adopted, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 1
House
03/13/2025
Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 3/17/2025
House
03/11/2025
Filed for introduction