LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Tennessee TN
Legislatures
2025-2026 Regular Session
House
Bills
HR0031
Action History
TN
Tennessee House Bill HR0031
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Tennessee 2025-2026 Regular Session
Tennessee House Bill HR0031
Action History
House
03/11/2025
Signed by H. Speaker
House
03/11/2025
Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
House
03/10/2025
Adopted, Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0
House
03/06/2025
Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 3/10/2025
House
03/05/2025
Filed for introduction