Senate | 03/19/2025 | Signed by Governor. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Transmitted to Governor for action. | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Signed by H. Speaker | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Signed by Senate Speaker | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Rules Suspended, Adopted voice vote | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Filed for introduction |