E | 06/19/2009 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6978 | |
E | 05/26/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5164 | |
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2913 | |
House | 05/25/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4818 | |
House | 05/25/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4992 | |
House | 05/21/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4303 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2623 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2623 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2623 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2623 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2623 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2623 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2623 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2193 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1657 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1657 | |
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 888 | |
House | 04/03/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1093 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1051 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Record vote | RV#98 | Journal Page: 1050 |
House | 04/02/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1050 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1050 | |
House | 04/01/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1030 | |
House | 04/01/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1030 | |
House | 04/01/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 969 | |
House | 03/19/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/19/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/12/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/12/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2009 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 390 | |
House | 02/23/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 390 | |
House | 02/03/2009 | Filed |