Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB103 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 103


 AN ACT
 relating to health benefit plans for students at institutions of
 higher education and the operation of certain health benefit plans
 through student health centers at certain institutions of higher
 education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. The heading to Section 51.952, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.952. STUDENT HEALTH INSURANCE AT MEDICAL AND DENTAL
 UNITS.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter Z, Chapter 51, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 51.9521 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.9521.  STUDENT HEALTH INSURANCE AT GENERAL ACADEMIC
 TEACHING INSTITUTIONS. (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Health benefit plan" means any health benefit
 plan regulated under the Insurance Code, including:
 (A)  an individual, group, or blanket health
 insurance policy; or
 (B)  an evidence of coverage issued by a health
 maintenance organization.
 (2)  "High deductible health plan" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 223, Internal Revenue Code of 1986.
 (3)  "General academic teaching institution" and
 "university system" have the meanings assigned by Section 61.003.
 (b)  A general academic teaching institution with a total
 student enrollment of more than 20,000 students in one or more
 semesters of the preceding academic year shall offer or sponsor,
 directly or through the university system, if any, of which the
 institution is a component, one or more health benefit plans for the
 students of the institution. At least one health benefit plan
 offered under this section must be a high deductible health plan.
 (c)  When offering the health benefit plan to students, the
 institution shall collect information from each student that
 declines to accept the coverage offered through the institution,
 including whether the decision to decline coverage was as a result
 of:
 (1)  the student's existing health benefit plan
 coverage from another source;
 (2) the cost of the health benefit plan;
 (3)  the type of health benefit plan offered by the
 institution; or
 (4)  the student not desiring a health benefit plan at
 that time.
 (d)  Data collected by the institution may be provided to the
 public in the aggregate.
 SECTION 3. The heading to Section 51.953, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.953. [CERTAIN REVENUE RECEIVED FROM] STUDENT HEALTH
 CENTER [SERVICES].
 SECTION 4. Section 51.953, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (c), (d), (e), (f), (g), and (h) to read as
 follows:
 (c)  A student health center of an institution of higher
 education with a total student enrollment of more than 20,000
 students in one or more semesters of the preceding academic year
 shall assist a student or other person entitled to obtain health
 care services through the health center in receiving benefits under
 a health benefit plan in which the student or other person is an
 enrollee by filing or having a claim filed with the issuer of the
 health benefit plan on behalf of the student or other person.  The
 institution may contract with a third-party billing service to
 provide the assistance required by this subsection.
 (d)  An institution of higher education, on behalf of the
 institution's student health center, may contract with a health
 benefit plan issuer that engages in the business of insurance in the
 health service region established by the Department of State Health
 Services in which the institution is located to provide a health
 benefit plan under which health care services are provided to
 students or other persons entitled to obtain health care services
 through the student health center who are covered by the plan.
 (e)  An institution of higher education described by
 Subsection (c) must enter into contracts with at least three of the
 largest health benefit plan issuers that engage in the business of
 insurance in the health service region established by the
 Department of State Health Services in which the institution is
 located under which the institution's student health center:
 (1)  serves as a preferred provider under the preferred
 provider benefit plans operated by the issuers; or
 (2)  operates as a provider of in-network coverage
 under the health maintenance organizations operated by the issuers.
 (f)  An institution of higher education may authorize the
 institution's student health center to accept a student's medical
 services fee, as charged by the institution under Chapter 54, as
 payment toward:
 (1) a copayment;
 (2) a deductible; or
 (3)  a charge for a service not covered by the student's
 health benefit plan.
 (g)  Money received by the student health center as a result
 of a claim filed by or on behalf of a student through a health
 benefit plan shall be retained for use by the student health center.
 (h)  Not later than January 15 of each year, the governing
 board of an institution of higher education described by Subsection
 (c) shall report to the legislature the amount of the following
 sources of income for funding the institution's student health
 center:
 (1) money received from student fees and charges;
 (2)  money received from the operation of the student
 health center's pharmacy;
 (3)  money received as a result of a claim filed by or
 on behalf of the institution's student health center under a health
 benefit plan sponsored by or administered on behalf of the
 institution; and
 (4)  money received as a result of a claim filed by or
 on behalf of the institution's student health center under a health
 benefit plan other than a plan sponsored by or administered on
 behalf of the institution.
 SECTION 5. Section 51.9521, Education Code, as added by
 this Act, applies beginning with the 2010 fall semester.
 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 103 was passed by the House on May 13,
 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 4, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 103 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 103 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 139,
 Nays 5, 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 103 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 27, Nays
 4; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 103 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 27, Nays 4.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor