Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 2092
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2092
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1879
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2337
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#412
|
Journal Page: 2169
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2169
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2169
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2148
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Parker
|
Journal Page: 2148
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2148
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1092
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 811
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 414
|
House
|
02/24/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 414
|
House
|
02/06/2009
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|