House | 05/13/2009 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3427 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1415 | Journal Page: 3427 |
House | 05/13/2009 | Postponed | 5/13/09 10:00 PM | Journal Page: 3411 |
House | 05/13/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3411 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Postponed | 5/13/09 8:00 AM | Journal Page: 3021 |
House | 05/08/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3021 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2594 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2009 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/25/2009 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 428 | |
House | 02/25/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 428 | |
House | 02/09/2009 | Filed |