Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1128 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 81R12558 YDB-D
22 By: McReynolds H.B. No. 1128
33 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 1128:
44 By: Laubenberg C.S.H.B. No. 1128
55
66
77 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
88 AN ACT
99 relating to certain corrective actions by the Texas Board of
1010 Nursing, including a pilot program on deferred disciplinary action;
1111 providing corrective actions.
1212 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1313 SECTION 1. Chapter 301, Occupations Code, is amended by
1414 adding Subchapter N to read as follows:
1515 SUBCHAPTER N. CORRECTIVE ACTION PROCEEDING
1616 Sec. 301.651. DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "corrective
1717 action" means a fine or remedial education imposed under Section
1818 301.652.
1919 Sec. 301.652. IMPOSITION OF CORRECTIVE ACTION. (a) The
2020 board may impose a corrective action on a person licensed or
2121 regulated under this chapter who violates this chapter or a rule or
2222 order adopted under this chapter. The corrective action:
2323 (1) may be a fine, remedial education, or any
2424 combination of a fine or remedial education;
2525 (2) is not a disciplinary action under Subchapter J;
2626 and
2727 (3) is subject to disclosure only to the extent a
2828 complaint is subject to disclosure under Section 301.466.
2929 (b) The board by rule shall adopt guidelines for the types
3030 of violations for which a corrective action may be imposed.
3131 Sec. 301.653. REPORT AND NOTICE OF VIOLATION AND CORRECTIVE
3232 ACTION. If the executive director determines that a person has
3333 committed a violation for which a corrective action may be imposed
3434 under the guidelines adopted under Section 301.652(b), the
3535 executive director may give written notice of the determination and
3636 recommendation for corrective action to the person subject to the
3737 corrective action. The notice may be given by certified mail. The
3838 notice must:
3939 (1) include a brief summary of the alleged violation;
4040 (2) state the recommended corrective action; and
4141 (3) inform the person of the person's options in
4242 responding to the notice.
4343 Sec. 301.654. RESPONSE. Not later than the 20th day after
4444 the date the person receives the notice under Section 301.653, the
4545 person may:
4646 (1) accept in writing the executive director's
4747 determination and recommended corrective action; or
4848 (2) reject the executive director's determination and
4949 recommended corrective action.
5050 Sec. 301.655. ACTION FOLLOWING RESPONSE. (a) If the person
5151 accepts the executive director's determination and satisfies the
5252 recommended corrective action, the case is closed.
5353 (b) If the person does not accept the executive director's
5454 determination and recommended corrective action as originally
5555 proposed or as modified by the board or fails to respond in a timely
5656 manner to the executive director's notice as provided by Section
5757 301.654, the executive director shall:
5858 (1) terminate proceedings under this subchapter; and
5959 (2) dispose of the matter as a complaint under
6060 Subchapter J.
6161 Sec. 301.656. REPORT TO BOARD. The executive director
6262 shall report periodically to the board on the corrective actions
6363 imposed under this subchapter, including:
6464 (1) the number of corrective actions imposed;
6565 (2) the types of violations for which corrective
6666 actions were imposed; and
6767 (3) whether affected nurses accepted the corrective
6868 actions.
6969 Sec. 301.657. EFFECT ON ACCEPTANCE OF CORRECTIVE ACTION.
7070 (a) Except to the extent provided by this section, a person's
7171 acceptance of a corrective action under this subchapter does not
7272 constitute an admission of a violation but does constitute a plea of
7373 nolo contendere.
7474 (b) The board may treat a person's acceptance of corrective
7575 action as an admission of a violation if the board imposes a
7676 sanction on the person for a subsequent violation of this chapter or
7777 a rule or order adopted under this chapter.
7878 SECTION 2. Subchapter D, Chapter 301, Occupations Code, is
7979 amended by adding Section 301.1607 to read as follows:
8080 Sec. 301.1607. PILOT PROGRAM ON DEFERRAL OF FINAL
8181 DISCIPLINARY ACTION. (a) In this section, "deferred disciplinary
8282 action" means a final disciplinary action against a person licensed
8383 or regulated under this chapter that is deferred by the board as
8484 provided by this section.
8585 (b) Not later than February 1, 2010, the board shall
8686 determine the feasibility of conducting a pilot program designed to
8787 evaluate the efficacy and effect on the public's protection of
8888 board deferral of disciplinary action against a person licensed or
8989 regulated under this chapter in cases in which the board proposes to
9090 impose a sanction other than a reprimand or a denial, suspension, or
9191 revocation of a license. If the board determines the pilot program
9292 is feasible, the board shall develop and implement the pilot
9393 program not later than February 1, 2011. The pilot program must
9494 conclude not later than January 1, 2014.
9595 (c) The pilot program may not include cases in which the
9696 board proposes to issue a reprimand or to deny, suspend, or revoke a
9797 license.
9898 (d) During the time the pilot program is implemented and for
9999 any action or complaint for which the board proposes to impose a
100100 sanction other than a reprimand or a denial, suspension, or
101101 revocation of a license, the board may:
102102 (1) defer final disciplinary action the board has
103103 proposed against a person licensed or regulated under this chapter
104104 if the person conforms to conditions imposed by the board,
105105 including any condition the board could impose as a condition of
106106 probation under Section 301.468; and
107107 (2) if the person successfully meets the imposed
108108 conditions, dismiss the complaint.
109109 (e) Except as otherwise provided by this subsection, a
110110 deferred disciplinary action by the board under the pilot program
111111 is not confidential and is subject to disclosure in accordance with
112112 Chapter 552, Government Code. If the person successfully meets the
113113 conditions imposed by the board in deferring final disciplinary
114114 action and the board dismisses the action or complaint, the
115115 deferred disciplinary action of the board is confidential to the
116116 same extent as a complaint filed under Section 301.466.
117117 (f) The board may contract with a third party to evaluate
118118 the pilot program established under this section.
119119 (g) The board shall appoint an advisory committee to assist
120120 the board in overseeing the pilot program and its evaluation. The
121121 committee must include representatives of public advocacy
122122 organizations.
123123 (h) This section expires September 1, 2014.
124124 SECTION 3. The changes in law made by this Act to Chapter
125125 301, Occupations Code, apply to actions for violations under
126126 Chapter 301 pending on the effective date of this Act or commenced
127127 on or after the effective date of this Act.
128128 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.