E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6978
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6967
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6975
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 5041
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5042
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6676
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1696
|
Journal Page: 6676
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6666
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6902
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5023
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4959
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6029
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6029
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4557
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4557
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4522
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4522
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4522
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5831
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5831
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5831
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5199
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3242
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3242
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3242
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3242
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3242
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3242
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3241
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA12 Van de Putte
|
Journal Page: 3240
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3195
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/26/09 10:30 AM
|
Journal Page: 3080
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3080
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3080
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2617
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 2390
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2390
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2311
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3440
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#765
|
Journal Page: 3235
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3235
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3235
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3166
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3166
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2594
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2009
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2009
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 467
|
House
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 467
|
House
|
02/12/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|