E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
|
E
|
06/01/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6976
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4986
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6027
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6903
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5204
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3584
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3584
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3584
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3584
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3584
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3584
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3584
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2714
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 2390
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2390
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2311
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3440
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#749
|
Journal Page: 3215
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3215
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3215
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3187
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3187
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2617
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 2149
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2009
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 472
|
House
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 472
|
House
|
02/13/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|