E | 06/19/2009 | Effective on 1/1/10 | ||
E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6978 | |
E | 06/03/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6977 | |
Senate | 06/03/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 5153 | |
House | 06/01/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6895 | |
House | 05/31/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6975 | |
House | 05/28/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5199 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3348 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3348 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3348 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 3348 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3347 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3347 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 3347 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 3165 | |
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 2179 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2179 | |
Senate | 05/08/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2143 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3042 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Record vote | RV#620 | Journal Page: 2691 |
House | 05/07/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2691 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2691 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2683 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2683 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2337 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/26/2009 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 475 | |
House | 02/26/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 475 | |
House | 02/17/2009 | Filed |